Global Patent Index - EP 2716180 B1

EP 2716180 B1 2017-10-04 - Height-adjustable office desk in particular for monitor screen work places

Title (en)

Height-adjustable office desk in particular for monitor screen work places

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbarer Bürotisch für insbesondere Bildschirm-Arbeitsplätze

Title (fr)

Bureau réglable en hauteur, en particulier pour poste de travail avec écran

Publication

EP 2716180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 13179256 A

Priority

DE 102012109469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2716180A1] The vertically adjustable office table has a table top (1), a guide pillar (3) fixed on the table top, a table column (4) for the guide pillar, and a spring element (6) interconnected between the table column and the guide pillar. A guiding element is provided for defining the telescoping movement between the guide pillar and the table column. The guiding element is formed as a threaded spindle drive (7,8) that is acted upon by a spring element, where the threaded spindle drive is provided with a head-sided connection element (9).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/02 (2006.01); A47B 9/04 (2006.01); A47B 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/02 (2013.01); A47B 9/04 (2013.01); A47B 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2716180 A1 20140409; EP 2716180 B1 20171004; DE 102012109469 A1 20140410; DK 2716180 T3 20180115; LT 2716180 T 20180326; PL 2716180 T3 20180330

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-02-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-01-17 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG, CH

2018-01-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20180111

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013008476

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 933206 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-06-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 9/20 20060101ALI20170404BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 9/02 20060101AFI20170404BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 9/04 20060101ALI20170404BHEP

2014-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140521

2014-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME