Global Patent Index - EP 2720593 A1

EP 2720593 A1 2014-04-23 - A PACKAGE OF SHEET PRODUCTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF

Title (en)

A PACKAGE OF SHEET PRODUCTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF

Title (de)

PACKUNG AUS BLATTPRODUKTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PAQUET DE PRODUITS EN FEUILLES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 2720593 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11867876 A

Priority

SE 2011050739 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012173533A1] The invention relates to a package (1) of folded sheet products, in particular hand wipes, made of tissue paper or nonwoven. The package (1) comprises a stack (2) of said sheet products, which stack (2) having an upper surface (3), a lower surface (4), and four side surfaces (5, 6, 7, 8) connecting said upper and lower surfaces (3, 4). A binding material (17) is applied on at least two opposite side surfaces (5, 6; 7, 8) of said stack (2) and bonded to at least two of said sheet products for retaining package integrity during handling thereof, whilst allowing separation of end sheet products (9; 11) from said package (1). A method for producing a package (1) is also provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/16 (2006.01); B65B 27/08 (2006.01); B65D 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/02 (2013.01); B65D 63/1009 (2013.01); B65D 83/08 (2013.01); B65B 27/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012173533 A1 20121220; AU 2011371023 A1 20140116; CN 103987305 A 20140813; EP 2720593 A1 20140423; EP 2720593 A4 20141203; MX 2013014520 A 20140131; RU 2014101064 A 20150720; RU 2558897 C1 20150810; US 2014110299 A1 20140424

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160205

2015-10-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150924

2014-12-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20141105

2014-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47K 10/16 20060101AFI20141030BHEP

2014-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 75/02 20060101ALI20141030BHEP

2014-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 27/08 20060101ALI20141030BHEP

2014-09-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2014-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131212

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR