Global Patent Index - EP 2721112 A1

EP 2721112 A1 2014-04-23 - ACID DYE MIXTURES FOR POLYAMIDE AND WOOL

Title (en)

ACID DYE MIXTURES FOR POLYAMIDE AND WOOL

Title (de)

SÄUREFARBSTOFFMISCHUNGEN FÜR POLYAMID UND WOLLE

Title (fr)

MÉLANGES DE COLORANTS ACIDES POUR POLYAMIDE ET LAINE

Publication

EP 2721112 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 12727600 A

Priority

  • DE 102011104360 A
  • EP 2012002496 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012171637A1] The invention relates to an acid dye mixture comprising a) between 20 and 95 wt. % of at least one dye A of general structure (A), and b) between 5 and 80 wt. % of at least one dye B of general structure (B).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/40 (2006.01); C09B 67/22 (2006.01); D06P 3/16 (2006.01); D06P 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09B 67/0033 (2013.01); D06P 1/40 (2013.01); D06P 3/16 (2013.01); D06P 3/241 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012171637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012171637 A1 20121220; BR 112013032201 A2 20161213; CN 103619961 A 20140305; EP 2721112 A1 20140423; JP 2014522443 A 20140904; KR 20140053956 A 20140508; MX 2013014768 A 20140528; TW 201313839 A 20130401

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160705

2016-03-23 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160222

2016-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARCHROMA IP GMBH

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C09B 67/22 20060101ALI20160128BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06P 3/16 20060101ALI20160128BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06P 1/40 20060101AFI20160128BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06P 3/24 20060101ALI20160128BHEP

2014-09-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2014-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR