Global Patent Index - EP 2721216 B1

EP 2721216 B1 2017-10-04 - SURFACE COVERING ESPECIALLY FOR THE PASSAGE OF VEHICLES

Title (en)

SURFACE COVERING ESPECIALLY FOR THE PASSAGE OF VEHICLES

Title (de)

OBERFLÄCHENABDECKUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR DURCHFAHRT VON FAHRZEUGEN

Title (fr)

REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE POUR LE PASSAGE NOTAMMENT DE VEHICULES

Publication

EP 2721216 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 12731037 A

Priority

  • FR 1155299 A
  • FR 2012051137 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US9016977B2] The present invention provides a surface covering for enabling a surface, e.g. of the uneven, muddy, marshy, or sandy ground type, to be crossed by a vehicle, said surface covering including a double-ply textile core having two covered faces, each covered with at least one polymer layer, and a plurality of through tubular pockets extending substantially transversely through the thickness of the core between the two layers, and enabling respective stiffener bars to be inserted into each tubular pocket so as to make it possible, in particular, to increase the drivability and the load-bearing capacity of the surface when the surface covering is positioned on said surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/086 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

CN 201924253 U 20110810 - RONGTIAN LI, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2012321382 A1 20121220; US 9016977 B2 20150428; BR 112013032497 A2 20170314; DE 202012013254 U1 20150901; EA 027184 B1 20170630; EA 201400028 A1 20140430; EP 2721216 A1 20140423; EP 2721216 B1 20171004; FR 2976598 A1 20121221; FR 3001238 A1 20140725; WO 2012172229 A1 20121220

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602012038113

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934162 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-08-23 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170725

2017-08-02 [INTC] FORMER COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT CANCELLED

2017-03-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170213

2015-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150915

2014-09-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2014-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-05-22 [REG DE R138] DERIVATION OF UTILITY MODEL

- Document: DE 202012013254

- Free text: GERMAN DOCUMENT NUMBER IS 602012038113