Global Patent Index - EP 2724821 B1

EP 2724821 B1 2017-10-04 - Power tool

Title (en)

Power tool

Title (de)

Kraftgetriebenes Handwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil électrique

Publication

EP 2724821 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 13180623 A

Priority

JP 2012197102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2724821A1] A power tool (10) includes a motor (21), an output shaft (25), and a power transmission unit (22) that transmits rotational power of the motor to the output shaft. The power transmission unit decreases a rotation speed in accordance with a speed reduction ratio that can be changed. A gear shift actuator (27) changes the speed reduction ratio. A torque detector (41) detects the load torque applied to the output shaft. A control unit (23) controls the gear shift actuator to change the speed reduction ratio of the power transmission unit in accordance with the detected load torque. The control unit stops driving the motor if the detected torque reaches a threshold during a predetermined period from when the power transmission unit increases the speed reduction ratio. The control unit continues driving the motor when the detected load torque does not reach the threshold during the predetermined period.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/008 (2013.01); B25B 23/147 (2013.01); B25F 5/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2724821 A1 20140430; EP 2724821 B1 20171004; CN 103659700 A 20140326; CN 103659700 B 20160427; JP 2014050923 A 20140320; JP 5914841 B2 20160511

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602013027390

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 933560 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-04-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170323

2015-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LT

2014-04-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130816

2014-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-04-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME