EP 2725352 A1 20140430 - Apparatus for non-contact metallic constructions assessment
Title (en)
Apparatus for non-contact metallic constructions assessment
Title (de)
Gerät zum berührungslosen Prüfen von metallischen Konstruktionen
Title (fr)
Appareil d'évaluation de structures métalliques sans contact
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201213662427 A 20121027
- US 201213674118 A 20121112
Abstract (en)
A device for metallic structure maintenance is disclosed. The device uses a magneto-graphic/Magnetic Tomography technique to identify stress-related defects. The device is specifically optimized to be used for extended, non-accessible underground and underwater metallic structures in providing quality control, emergency alarms as well as timeline planning for structural repairs and maintenance work. Examples of the use of the device include pipes for oil and gas industry, detection of flaws in rolled products in metallurgical industry, welding quality of heavy duty equipment such as ships reservoirs, etc. It is especially important for loaded constructions, such as pressured pipes, infrastructure maintenance, nuclear power plant monitoring, bridges, corrosion prevention and environment protection.
IPC 8 full level
G01N 27/85 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G01N 27/82 (2013.01 - US); G01N 27/85 (2013.01 - EP US); G01V 3/087 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 4806862 A 19890221 - KOZLOV VALERY S [SU], et al
- US 4930026 A 19900529 - KLJUEV VLADIMIR V [SU], et al
- US 482669 A 18920913
- US 6205859 B1 20010327 - KWUN HEGEON [US], et al
- US 201113336302 A 20111223
- RU 2264617 C2 20051120
- US 4998208 A 19910305 - BUHROW ROBERT P [US], et al
- US 6813949 B2 20041109 - MASANIELLO RICHARD [US], et al
- RU 2110011 C1 19980427 - DISSO, et al
- US 2006283251 A1 20061221 - HUNAIDI OSAMA [CA], et al
- US 4641529 A 19870210 - LORENZI DONALD E [US], et al
- US 7941282 B2 20110510 - ZIEGEL ERIC R [US], et al
- RU 2139515 C1 19991010 - ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHES, et al
- US 4309659 A 19820105 - YOSHII TANEKAGE
- RU 2037888 C1 19950619 - PHILIPS NV [NL]
Citation (search report)
- [XDAI] RU 2264617 C2 20051120
- [A] US 2010030491 A1 20100204 - ZIEGEL ERIC R [US], et al
- [XAI] KEXI LIAO ET AL: "Principle and technical characteristics of non-contact magnetic tomography method inspection for oil and gas pipeline", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PIPELINES AND TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY 2011 : (ICPTT 2011) ; BEIJING, CHINA, 26 - 29 OCTOBER 2011,, 26 October 2011 (2011-10-26), pages 1039 - 1048, XP009172339, ISBN: 978-1-61839-212-1, DOI: 10.1061/41202(423)111
- [A] HUAIXIN ZHANG ET AL: "Oil and Gas Pipeline Quantitative Risk Assessment System Development with Intermediate Database Technology", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PIPELINES AND TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY 2011: (ICPTT 2011); BEIJING, CHINA, 26 - 29 OCTOBER 2011,, 26 October 2011 (2011-10-26), pages 569 - 577, XP009172337, ISBN: 978-1-61839-212-1, DOI: 10.1061/41202(423)63
- [A] SZYMON GONTARZ ET AL: "Use of passive magnetic method for stress assessment", RELIABILITY, MAINTAINABILITY AND SAFETY, 2009. ICRMS 2009. 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 20 July 2009 (2009-07-20), pages 966 - 971, XP031532841, ISBN: 978-1-4244-4903-3
- [A] KEXI LIAO ET AL: "Standard and Application by Using Non-Contact Magnetic Tomography Method for Pipeline Technical Conditions Diagnosis", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PIPELINES AND TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY 2011: (ICPTT 2011); BEIJING, CHINA, 26 - 29 OCTOBER 2011,, 26 October 2011 (2011-10-26), pages 1049 - 1058, XP009172387, ISBN: 978-1-61839-212-1, DOI: 10.1061/41202(423)112
- [A] CARDENAS ORTIZ ET AL: "A comparative study of unpiggable pipeline inspection techniques", PIPELINE PIGGING AND INTEGRITY MANAGEMENT: PPIM 2012; 24TH YEAR; HOUSTON, FEBRUARY 8 - 9; INCORPORATING UNPIGGABLE PIPELINE SOLUTIONS FORUM,, vol. 24, 8 February 2012 (2012-02-08), pages 1 - 18, XP009172381
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2725352 A1 20140430; CA 2826139 A1 20140117; CA 2826139 C 20140819; EP 2808677 A1 20141203; EP 2808677 B1 20210922; US 8949042 B1 20150203
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 13174467 A 20130701; CA 2826139 A 20130904; EP 14175952 A 20130701; US 201414242938 A 20140402