Global Patent Index - EP 2746703 A3

EP 2746703 A3 2017-10-11 - Door for a domestic refrigeration device with a handle that can be slid without dismantling and domestic refrigerator and method for positioning a handle

Title (en)

Door for a domestic refrigeration device with a handle that can be slid without dismantling and domestic refrigerator and method for positioning a handle

Title (de)

Tür für ein Haushaltskältegerät mit einem zerlegefrei positionell verschiebbaren Griffteil sowie Haushaltskältegerät und Verfahren zur Positionierung eines Griffteils

Title (fr)

Porte d'appareil frigorifique ménager avec poignée repositionnable sans démontage, appareil frigorifique ménager et procédé de positionnement d'une poignée

Publication

EP 2746703 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 13196741 A

Priority

DE 102012223648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2746703A2] The door (2) has a grip unit (15) that is attached at various positions (16,17) based on the selected stop sides (2a,2b) at a door base structure (2d). The grip unit is arranged at a positioning device (18). The grip unit is moved between the corresponding positions by the positioning device for connection at the door base structure through the stop sides. Independent claims are included for the following: (1) a household cooling apparatus; and (2) a method for positioning a grip unit at door base structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/028 (2013.01); F25D 23/025 (2013.01); F25D 2323/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2746703 A2 20140625; EP 2746703 A3 20171011; DE 102012223648 A1 20140618

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20180411

2018-05-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 23/02 20060101AFI20170907BHEP

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2014-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GLASER, BENJAMIN

2014-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CIYANOGLU, MEHMET

2014-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHUNDNER, PETER

2014-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131211

2014-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME