Global Patent Index - EP 2748439 B1

EP 2748439 B1 2017-10-04 - METERING SYSTEM FOR A LIQUID REDUCING AGENT

Title (en)

METERING SYSTEM FOR A LIQUID REDUCING AGENT

Title (de)

DOSIERSYSTEM FÜR EIN FLÜSSIGES REDUKTIONSMITTEL

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE POUR UN AGENT DE RÉDUCTION LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 2748439 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 12733139 A

Priority

  • DE 102011081628 A
  • EP 2012063342 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2013029849A1] Proposed is a dosing module for injecting liquid urea-water solution into the exhaust tract of an internal combustion engine, which dosing module is composed of two pumps, specifically a delivery pump (5) and an aeration pump (15). This permits firstly the injection of urea-water solutions and secondly safe and reliable ventilation of the system when the internal combustion engine is to be shut down.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/24 (2006.01); B01D 53/94 (2006.01); F01N 3/10 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F04B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/10 (2013.01); F01N 3/2066 (2013.01); F01N 3/208 (2013.01); F01N 3/24 (2013.01); F01N 2610/02 (2013.01); F01N 2610/1433 (2013.01); F01N 2610/1466 (2013.01); F01N 2610/1473 (2013.01); F01N 2610/1493 (2013.01); F04B 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102011081628 A1 20130228; CN 103782002 A 20140507; CN 103782002 B 20170322; EP 2748439 A1 20140702; EP 2748439 B1 20171004; JP 2014524542 A 20140922; JP 6012732 B2 20161025; US 2014227120 A1 20140814; US 9562455 B2 20170207; WO 2013029849 A1 20130307

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180105

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180204

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-07 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171004

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502012011394

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934271 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-07-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/20 20060101ALI20170512BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01D 53/94 20060101ALI20170512BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 23/10 20060101ALI20170512BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/10 20060101ALI20170512BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/24 20060101AFI20170512BHEP

2017-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170313

2014-12-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2014-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR