Global Patent Index - EP 2756898 A3

EP 2756898 A3 2017-10-18 - Method for the production of castings for electrical applications

Title (en)

Method for the production of castings for electrical applications

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Gussteilen für elektrische Anwendungen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de pièces moulées pour des applications électriques

Publication

EP 2756898 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 14000063 A

Priority

DE 102013000746 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2756898A2] The method comprises melting and filling a hardenable aluminum alloy into a die casting mold (4), and cooling the melted aluminum alloy (1) by the mold made of a material having a thermal conductivity causing the melted aluminum alloy to be cooled at a cooling rate >= 5x 10 2> K/s, where the melted aluminum alloy is introduced into a filling chamber (2) and is displaced at a minimal displacement speed within the filling chamber, prior to the filling step. The molten alloy is displaced at a low speed of less than 0.5 m/s in a filling chamber in the first phase. The method comprises melting and filling a hardenable aluminum alloy into a die casting mold (4), and cooling the melted aluminum alloy (1) by the mold made of a material having a thermal conductivity causing the melted aluminum alloy to be cooled at a cooling rate >= 5x 10 2> K/s, where the melted aluminum alloy is introduced into a filling chamber (2) and is displaced at a minimal displacement speed within the filling chamber, prior to the filling step. The molten alloy is displaced at a low speed of less than 0.5 m/s in a filling chamber in the first phase. The molten alloy is moved at high speed of 1-3 m/s from the filling chamber into the die-casting mold in a second phase. The molten alloy is set after complete filling of the die under pressure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/10 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01); B22D 17/32 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2013.01); B22D 17/10 (2013.01); B22D 17/2069 (2013.01); B22D 17/2209 (2013.01); B22D 17/32 (2013.01); B22D 19/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 2014051916 A2 20140403 - APPLE INC [US]
  • [A] EP 2465624 A1 20120620 - KIENLE & SPIESS GMBH [DE]
  • [A] WO 2008020763 A1 20080221 - NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al
  • [T] HTTPS: "Burkhard Fuchs (Autor) Salzkerntechnologie für Hohlgussbauteile im Druckguss", 25 July 2014 (2014-07-25), XP055334765, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://cuvillier.de/uploads/preview/public_file/8830/Leseprobe.pdf> [retrieved on 20170112]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2756898 A2 20140723; EP 2756898 A3 20171018; DE 102013000746 A1 20140717; JP 2014136258 A 20140728; MX 2014000520 A 20140807; US 2014196862 A1 20140717

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-30 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20180418

2018-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 17/22 20060101ALI20170911BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 17/10 20060101ALI20170911BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 17/20 20060101ALI20170911BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 17/00 20060101AFI20170911BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 19/00 20060101ALI20170911BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 17/32 20060101ALI20170911BHEP

2014-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME