Global Patent Index - EP 2796565 B1

EP 2796565 B1 2017-10-04 - BLAST FURNACE OPERATION METHOD

Title (en)

BLAST FURNACE OPERATION METHOD

Title (de)

BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN HOCHOFEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION DE HAUT FOURNEAU

Publication

EP 2796565 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 12859458 A

Priority

  • JP 2011279955 A
  • JP 2012055886 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2013094229A1] A blast furnace operation method, whereby the combustion temperature can be increased even if the volatile amount of pulverized coal is no more than 25 mass% and a high pulverized coal ratio operation is being used whereby the pulverized coal ratio is at least 150 kg/t, and, as a result, CO2 emissions can be reduced, by: using a double-piped lance (4) for blowing in fuel from a tuyere (3); blowing in the pulverized coal from the inner pipe of the double-piped lance (4); blowing in oxygen from the outer pipe of the double-piped lance (4); and having the oxygen concentration being at least 35 vol% for the gas comprising the carrier gas for the pulverized coal and the gas blown in from the outer pipe. In addition, the oxygen concentration is less than 70 vol% when the pulverized coal ratio is at least 170 kg/t. Furthermore, increased concentration of pulverized coal flow is prevented and fuel efficiency can be maintained by arranging the double-piped lance (4) such that the pulverized coal flows blown in from the two pipes of the double-piped lance (4) do not overlap.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 5/00 (2006.01); C21B 7/00 (2006.01); C21B 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 5/003 (2013.01); C21B 7/163 (2013.01); C21B 2005/005 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2013094229 A1 20130627; AU 2012355193 A1 20140724; AU 2012355193 B2 20150910; CN 104039985 A 20140910; EP 2796565 A1 20141029; EP 2796565 A4 20151104; EP 2796565 B1 20171004; IN 1257KON2014 A 20151016; KR 101629122 B1 20160609; KR 20140109963 A 20140916; TW 201326404 A 20130701; TW I495729 B 20150811

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602012038254

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934095 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-07-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170609

2015-11-04 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21B 5/00 20060101AFI20150925BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21B 7/00 20060101ALI20150925BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21B 7/16 20060101ALI20150925BHEP

2015-04-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2014-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR