Global Patent Index - EP 2798967 B1

EP 2798967 B1 2017-10-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTERS FOR THE TOBACCO-PROCESSING INDUSTRY, AND MULTI-SEGMENT FILTER MANUFACTURING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTERS FOR THE TOBACCO-PROCESSING INDUSTRY, AND MULTI-SEGMENT FILTER MANUFACTURING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON MULTISEGMENTFILTERN DER TABAK VERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE UND MULTISEGMENTFILTERHERSTELLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILTRES MULTISEGMENTS DE L'INDUSTRIE DE TRAITEMENT DU TABAC ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE FILTRES MULTISEGMENTS

Publication

EP 2798967 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 13166250 A

Priority

EP 13166250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN104126869A] The invention relates to a method for producing multi-segment filters for the tobacco processing industry. The invention also relates to a multi-segment filter manufacturing device having a multi-segment filter assembling device, the multi-segment filter assembling device is configured to assemble a filter segment group in transportation in a horizontal axis direction, a transfer device is arranged, the transfer device transfers the assembled filter segment group to a rod forming device, and the rod forming device transports the filter segment group in a longitudinal axis direction. According to the method in the invention, filter segment group flows which are transported in the horizontal axis direction and arranged in parallel in longitudinal axis direction are formed firstly, a gap is formed subsequently in the filter segment group by moving at least one filter segment in the longitudinal axis direction, and the filter segment group provided with the gap is subsequently transferred to a filter rod that is transported in the longitudinal axis direction. The device according to the invention is characterized in that the transfer device includes a separating roller by virtue of which the gap is formed or can be formed in the filter segment group that is formed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/0225 (2013.01); A24D 3/0287 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2798967 A1 20141105; EP 2798967 B1 20171025; CN 104126869 A 20141105; PL 2798967 T3 20180430

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180225

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-01-31 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013008635

2017-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 939023 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-07-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170608

2017-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRASSE, VOLKHARDT

2016-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2015-06-03 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130502

2014-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME