Global Patent Index - EP 2807167 A4

EP 2807167 A4 20160120 - INDOLE AND BENZOFURAN FUSED ISOQUINUCLIDENE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING THEM

Title (en)

INDOLE AND BENZOFURAN FUSED ISOQUINUCLIDENE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING THEM

Title (de)

INDOL- UND BENZOFURANKONDENSIERTE ISOCHINUCLIDENDERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON

Title (fr)

DÉRIVÉS D'ISOQUINUCLIDÈNE RÉUNIS PAR FUSION À DE L'INDOLE ET DU BENZOFURANE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION

Publication

EP 2807167 A4 20160120 (EN)

Application

EP 13741381 A 20130124

Priority

  • US 201261590740 P 20120125
  • US 201261741798 P 20120125
  • US 201261591258 P 20120126
  • US 2012022787 W 20120126
  • US 2013023017 W 20130124

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2013112757A1] Provided herein are indole and benzofuran fused isoquinuclidene derivatives. Also provided herein are processes, preferably enantioselective processes, for preparing such derivatives including processes for preparing (-) and (+) noribogaine or a salt thereof, in substantially enantiomerically pure forms.

IPC 8 full level

C07D 451/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/46 (2006.01); C07D 491/10 (2006.01); C07D 495/10 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C07D 487/14 (2013.01); C07D 487/22 (2013.01); C07D 491/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 2011103007 A2 20110825 - SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al
  • [Y] US 7220737 B1 20070522 - MASH DEBORAH C [US]
  • [E] WO 2013112673 A1 20130801 - DEMERX INC [US], et al
  • [XP] WO 2012012764 A1 20120126 - DEMERX INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 2013085850 A2 20130613 - DEMERX INC [US], et al
  • [XY] GOUTAM KUMAR JANA ET AL: "Progress in the Synthesis of Iboga-alkaloids and their Congeners", ORGANIC PREPARATIONS AND PROCEDURES INTERNATIONAL, vol. 43, no. 6, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), pages 541 - 573, XP055160017, ISSN: 0030-4948, DOI: 10.1080/00304948.2011.629563
  • [X] STEFAN HÖCK ET AL: "Enantioselective Synthesis of (-)-(19R)-Ibogamin-19-ol", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 89, no. 3, 1 March 2006 (2006-03-01), pages 542 - 557, XP055165486, ISSN: 0018-019X, DOI: 10.1002/hlca.200690058
  • [X] GOUTAM KUMAR JANA ET AL: "Reductive Heck coupling: an efficient approach toward the iboga alkaloids. Synthesis of ibogamine, epiibogamine and iboga analogs", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 53, no. 13, 22 January 2012 (2012-01-22), pages 1671 - 1674, XP028459581, ISSN: 0040-4039, [retrieved on 20120128], DOI: 10.1016/J.TETLET.2012.01.097
  • [XY] WHITE J D ET AL: "Catalyzed asymmetric Diels - Alder reactions of benzoquinone. Total synthesis of (-)-ibogamine", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA 2002 CH, vol. 85, no. 12, 2002, pages 4306 - 4327, XP002751997, ISSN: 0018-019X
  • See also references of WO 2013112757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2013112757 A1 20130801; CA 2858105 A1 20130801; EP 2807167 A1 20141203; EP 2807167 A4 20160120

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 2013023017 W 20130124; CA 2858105 A 20130124; EP 13741381 A 20130124