Global Patent Index - EP 2808812 A4

EP 2808812 A4 20160511 - ANALYSIS DEVICE AND SIMULATION METHOD

Title (en)

ANALYSIS DEVICE AND SIMULATION METHOD

Title (de)

ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND SIMULATIONSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SIMULATION

Publication

EP 2808812 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 12866680 A

Priority

  • JP 2012013721 A
  • JP 2012005069 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2014309975A1] An analysis device includes a unit cell acquisition unit configured to acquire a unit cell under a period boundary condition reflecting symmetry of an object to be analyzed, a unit particle system acquisition unit configured to acquire a unit particle system including a plurality of unit particles in the unit cell acquired by the unit cell acquisition unit, and a numerical computation unit configured to numerically compute a governing equation, which governs the motion of each unit particle of the unit particle system acquired by the unit particle system acquisition unit, under the period boundary condition. The numerical computation unit moves the boundary of the unit cell to simulate the movement of the object to be analyzed during computation.

IPC 8 full level

G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

G06F 30/20 (2020.01 - EP US); G16B 15/00 (2019.02 - US); G16C 10/00 (2019.02 - EP US); G16C 60/00 (2019.02 - EP US); G06F 2111/10 (2020.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] JP 2002243722 A 20020828 - UMEYAMA HIDEAKI, et al
  • [XA] JP 2006172207 A 20060629 - CANON KK
  • [XA] AMITAVA ROY ET AL: "Microscopic Symmetry Imposed by Rotational Symmetry Boundary Conditions in Molecular Dynamics Simulation", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL THEORY AND COMPUTATION: JCTC, vol. 7, no. 10, 11 October 2011 (2011-10-11), US, pages 3346 - 3353, XP055262113, ISSN: 1549-9618, DOI: 10.1021/ct2000843
  • [XA] AZUMA H ET AL: "Structure and dynamics of the GH loop of the foot-and-mouth disease virus capsid", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR GRAPHICS AND MODELLING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 28, no. 3, 1 October 2009 (2009-10-01), pages 278 - 286, XP026670541, ISSN: 1093-3263, [retrieved on 20090815], DOI: 10.1016/J.JMGM.2009.08.006
  • [XAYI] CAI ET AL: "Crack initiation in relation to the tool edge radius and cutting conditions in nanoscale cutting of silicon", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MACHINE TOOL DESIGN AND RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 47, no. 3-4, 15 December 2006 (2006-12-15), pages 562 - 569, XP005804246, ISSN: 0020-7357, DOI: 10.1016/J.IJMACHTOOLS.2006.05.006
  • [YA] T. INAMURA ET AL: "Crack Initiation in Machining Monocrystalline Silicon", CIRP ANNALS., vol. 48, no. 1, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), NL, CH, FR, pages 81 - 84, XP055262199, ISSN: 0007-8506, DOI: 10.1016/S0007-8506(07)63136-9
  • See also references of WO 2013111204A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

US 2014309975 A1 20141016; EP 2808812 A1 20141203; EP 2808812 A4 20160511; JP 2013152658 A 20130808; JP 5844165 B2 20160113; WO 2013111204 A1 20130801

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 201414315744 A 20140626; EP 12866680 A 20120809; JP 2012005069 W 20120809; JP 2012013721 A 20120126