Global Patent Index - EP 2809408 A4

EP 2809408 A4 2015-07-22 - FORCE FEEDBACK TRIGGERS

Title (en)

FORCE FEEDBACK TRIGGERS

Title (de)

KRAFTRÜCKKOPPLUNGSAUSLÖSER

Title (fr)

MANETTE À RETOUR DE FORCE

Publication

EP 2809408 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 13743824 A

Priority

  • US 201213361830 A
  • US 2013023695 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2013194085A1] A force feedback trigger includes an input device comprising a communication subsystem configured to provide bidirectional communication with a computing device. The input device further comprises a force feedback trigger assembly including a user-actuatable trigger configured to pivot about a trigger axis responsive to an applied external force. The input device further comprises a trigger vibrator directly coupled to the force feedback trigger assembly and communicatively coupled to the communication subsystem, the trigger vibrator configured to vibrate the user-actuatable trigger responsive to a vibration signal received from the computing device via the communication subsystem.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/24 (2014.01); A63F 13/285 (2014.01); G06F 3/0338 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/285 (2014.09); A63F 13/06 (2013.01); A63F 13/24 (2014.09); G06F 3/016 (2013.01); A63F 2300/1037 (2013.01); A63F 2300/1043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XI] GB 2327047 A 19990113 - KONAMI CO LTD [JP]
  • [XI] JP 2000126449 A 20000509 - SNK KK
  • [I] US 5643087 A 19970701 - MARCUS BETH A [US], et al
  • [A] US 2011081969 A1 20110407 - IKEDA AKIO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 2008158149 A1 20080703 - LEVIN MICHAEL D [US]
  • [A] ANONYMOUS: "Xbox.com | Accessories - Xbox 360(TM) Wireless Controller", ARCHIVE.ORG, 22 August 2008 (2008-08-22), XP055193968, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20080822143459/http://www.xbox.com/en-US/hardware/x/xbox360wirelesscontroller/> [retrieved on 20150605]
  • [A] ANONYMOUS: "Xbox.com | Media Viewer - Xbox 360(TM) Wireless Controller ScreenShot", ARCHIVE.ORG, 19 December 2008 (2008-12-19), XP055193970, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20081219174212/http://www.xbox.com/en-US/games/viewer.aspx?productId=984&assetTypeId=1&shotId=1> [retrieved on 20150605]
  • See also references of WO 2013116247A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family

US 2013194085 A1 20130801; US 9050529 B2 20150609; CN 103182184 A 20130703; CN 103182184 B 20160106; EP 2809408 A1 20141210; EP 2809408 A4 20150722; EP 2809408 B1 20180725; HK 1187014 A1 20160819; JP 2015511355 A 20150416; JP 6110879 B2 20170405; KR 101974683 B1 20190502; KR 20140119790 A 20141010; WO 2013116247 A1 20130808