Global Patent Index - EP 2841101 A4

EP 2841101 A4 20160224 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED TO ANTIBODIES THAT NEUTRALIZE COAGULASE ACTIVITY DURING STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS DISEASE

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED TO ANTIBODIES THAT NEUTRALIZE COAGULASE ACTIVITY DURING STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS DISEASE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR NEUTRALISIERUNG DER KOAGULASEAKTIVITÄT BEI EINER STAPHYLOCOCCUS-AUREUS-ERKRANKUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS À DES ANTICORPS QUI NEUTRALISENT L'ACTIVITÉ COAGULASE DANS UNE MALADIE À STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS

Publication

EP 2841101 A4 20160224 (EN)

Application

EP 13781905 A 20130315

Priority

  • US 201261638797 P 20120426
  • US 2013031927 W 20130315

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2013162751A1] Embodiments concern methods and compositions for treating or preventing a bacterial infection, particularly infection by a Staphylococcus bacterium. Aspects include methods and compositions for providing a passive immune response against the bacteria, in certain embodiments, the methods and compositions involve an antibody that binds Coagulase (Coa).

IPC 8 full level

A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/31 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

A61P 31/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/04 (2018.01 - EP); C07K 16/1271 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 38/00 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2317/24 (2013.01 - US); C07K 2317/33 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2317/565 (2013.01 - US); C07K 2317/569 (2013.01 - US); C07K 2317/76 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2317/92 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] WO 2011005341 A2 20110113 - UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al
  • [I] ALICE G. CHENG ET AL: "Contribution of Coagulases towards Staphylococcus aureus Disease and Protective Immunity", PLOS PATHOGENS, vol. 6, no. 8, 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), pages 1 - 18, XP055174922, DOI: 10.1371/journal.ppat.1001036
  • [I] ANDREA DEDENT ET AL: "Exploringpathways to disease for vaccine development", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 34, no. 2, 1 December 2011 (2011-12-01), pages 317 - 333, XP035012130, ISSN: 1863-2300, DOI: 10.1007/S00281-011-0299-Z
  • [I] MOLLY MCADOW ET AL: "<i>Staphylococcus aureus</i> Secretes Coagulase and von Willebrand Factor Binding Protein to Modify the Coagulation Cascade and Establish Host Infections", JOURNAL OF INNATE IMMUNITY, vol. 4, no. 2, 1 January 2012 (2012-01-01), pages 141 - 148, XP055174923, ISSN: 1662-811X, DOI: 10.1159/000333447
  • [IDP] M. MCADOW ET AL: "Coagulases as Determinants of Protective Immune Responses against Staphylococcus aureus", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 80, no. 10, 23 July 2012 (2012-07-23), pages 3389 - 3398, XP055174928, ISSN: 0019-9567, DOI: 10.1128/IAI.00562-12
  • [A] MOLLY MCADOW ET AL: "Preventing Staphylococcus aureus Sepsis through the Inhibition of Its Agglutination in Blood", PLOS PATHOGENS, vol. 7, no. 10, 20 October 2011 (2011-10-20), pages e1002307, XP055206042, DOI: 10.1371/journal.ppat.1002307
  • [A] FRIEDRICH R ET AL: "Staphylocoagulase is a prototype for the mechanism of cofactor-induced zymogen activation", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 425, no. 6957, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 535 - 539, XP008129241, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [A] LISA L. LORENZ ET AL: "Staphylococcal Coagulase: Mode of Action and Antigenicity", MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 6, no. 1-2, 1 February 1952 (1952-02-01), GB, pages 95 - 107, XP055240995, ISSN: 1350-0872, DOI: 10.1099/00221287-6-1-2-95
  • See also references of WO 2013162751A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2013162751 A1 20131031; AU 2013252888 A1 20141211; AU 2013252888 B2 20180614; BR 112014026808 A2 20180515; CA 2910320 A1 20131031; CN 104703622 A 20150610; CN 104703622 B 20170524; EP 2841101 A1 20150304; EP 2841101 A4 20160224; EP 2841101 B1 20190807; HK 1207321 A1 20160129; JP 2015515492 A 20150528; JP 2018058871 A 20180412; JP 6251730 B2 20171220; NZ 702282 A 20160729; US 2015368322 A1 20151224; US 2017306004 A1 20171026; US 9701738 B2 20170711

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 2013031927 W 20130315; AU 2013252888 A 20130315; BR 112014026808 A 20130315; CA 2910320 A 20130315; CN 201380033151 A 20130315; EP 13781905 A 20130315; HK 15108152 A 20150824; JP 2015508964 A 20130315; JP 2017226624 A 20171127; NZ 70228213 A 20130315; US 201314397049 A 20130315; US 201715627670 A 20170620