EP 2847197 A4 20151104 - PRODRUGS OF ANTI-PLATELET AGENTS
Title (en)
PRODRUGS OF ANTI-PLATELET AGENTS
Title (de)
PRODRUGS VON ANTIBLUTPLÄTTCHENMITTELN
Title (fr)
PROMÉDICAMENTS D'AGENTS ANTIPLAQUETTAIRES
Publication
Application
Priority
- IN 1781CH2012 A 20120507
- IB 2012053673 W 20120719
- IB 2013052328 W 20130324
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2013168024A1] Disclosed is the compounds of formula (I), formula (II), formula (la), formula (IIb) or its pharmaceutical acceptable salts, polymorphs, solvates, enantiomers, stereoisomers and hydrates thereof. The pharmaceutical compositions comprising and effective amount of formula (I), formula (II), formula (la), formula (lIb) and may be used to treatment or management of ischemia, stroke, cerebral thrombosis, arterial thrombosis, thrombotic cerebrovascular, cardiovasculard diseases and blood colts.
IPC 8 full level
C07D 495/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/4365 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C07D 211/72 (2006.01)
CPC (source: CN EP)
A61P 7/02 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 9/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 9/10 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 25/00 (2017.12 - EP); C07D 211/72 (2013.01 - CN EP); C07D 409/12 (2013.01 - CN); C07D 495/04 (2013.01 - CN EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 2004094374 A2 20041104 - RHODIA PHARMA SOLUTIONS INC FO [US]
- [IP] WO 2013024376 A1 20130221 - KANDULA MAHESH [IN]
- [I] EP 1889835 A1 20080220 - DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]
- [I] PATRICK M. DANSETTE ET AL: "Formation and Fate of a Sulfenic Acid Intermediate in the Metabolic Activation of the Antithrombotic Prodrug Prasugrel +", CHEMICAL RESEARCH IN TOXICOLOGY, vol. 23, no. 7, 19 July 2010 (2010-07-19), pages 1268 - 1274, XP055020962, ISSN: 0893-228X, DOI: 10.1021/tx1001332
- [I] SANGKUHL KATRIN ET AL: "Clopidogrel pathway", PHARMACOGENETICS AND GENOMICS, vol. 20, no. 7, 1 July 2010 (2010-07-01), LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, pages 463 - 465, XP009171644, ISSN: 1744-6872, DOI: 10.1097/FPC.0B013E3283385420
- [I] M. KAZUI ET AL: "Identification of the Human Cytochrome P450 Enzymes Involved in the Two Oxidative Steps in the Bioactivation of Clopidogrel to Its Pharmacologically Active Metabolite", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, vol. 38, no. 1, 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), pages 92 - 99, XP055020943, ISSN: 0090-9556, DOI: 10.1124/dmd.109.029132
- [I] CHEN J. F. ET AL.: "Synthesis of clopidogrel analogues and their antiplatelet aggregation actvities", HECHENG HUAXUE, vol. 18, no. 5, 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), pages 586 - 590, XP009186089
- See references of WO 2013168024A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2013168024 A1 20131114; AU 2013257745 A1 20141127; CA 2873094 A1 20131114; CN 104379589 A 20150225; EP 2847197 A1 20150318; EP 2847197 A4 20151104; JP 2015519334 A 20150709; SG 11201407307Y A 20141230; ZA 201408064 B 20160428
DOCDB simple family (application)
IB 2013052328 W 20130324; AU 2013257745 A 20130324; CA 2873094 A 20130324; CN 201380030644 A 20130324; EP 13787471 A 20130324; JP 2015510901 A 20130324; SG 11201407307Y A 20130324; ZA 201408064 A 20141104