EP 2877097 A4 20160413 - MANIPULATION OF IMAGING PROBE DURING MEDICAL PROCEDURE
Title (en)
MANIPULATION OF IMAGING PROBE DURING MEDICAL PROCEDURE
Title (de)
MANIPULATION EINER BILDGEBUNGSSONDE BEI MEDIZINISCHEN VERFAHREN
Title (fr)
MANIPULATION D'UNE SONDE D'IMAGERIE PENDANT UNE INTERVENTION MÉDICALE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201261676429 P 20120727
- US 201361799385 P 20130315
- US 2013052582 W 20130729
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2014018983A1] An imaging probe manipulator for use during a medical procedure includes a first manipulator linkage having a connector configured to attach to an imaging probe, a second manipulator linkage coupled to the first manipulator linkage at a first joint a third manipulator linkage coupled to the first or second manipulator linkage at a second joint. The first joint or the second joint has a degree of freedom. The imaging probe manipulator includes a force control transmission linked to the degree of freedom. The force control transmission component is configured to maintain a pre-determined force on the imaging probe when the imaging probe is in contact with a patient.
IPC 8 full level
A61B 6/00 (2006.01); A61B 6/02 (2006.01); A61B 8/00 (2006.01); A61B 8/08 (2006.01); A61N 5/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: CN EP US)
A61B 6/032 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61B 6/4417 (2013.01 - EP US); A61B 6/5247 (2013.01 - EP US); A61B 8/085 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61B 8/0875 (2013.01 - CN US); A61B 8/4218 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61B 8/4263 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61B 8/4416 (2013.01 - EP US); A61B 8/4444 (2013.01 - CN US); A61B 8/5261 (2013.01 - EP US); A61B 8/54 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61N 5/1039 (2013.01 - CN US); A61N 5/1049 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61N 5/1082 (2013.01 - CN US); A61B 8/4245 (2013.01 - CN EP US); A61N 2005/1058 (2013.01 - CN EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [YPA] US 2013085387 A1 20130404 - CHEN YU-JEN [TW], et al
- [IAY] SCHLOSSER JEFFREY ET AL: "Telerobotic system concept for real-time soft-tissue imaging during radiotherapy beam delivery", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 37, no. 12, 22 November 2010 (2010-11-22), pages 6357 - 6367, XP012144806, ISSN: 0094-2405, DOI: 10.1118/1.3515457
- [YA] SCHLOSSER1 J ET AL: "Hybrid X-Ray/Ultrasound Imaging Approach for Patient Positioning and Real?Time Tracking in IGRT", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), XP009188731, ISSN: 0094-2405
- [YA] DILLENSEGER J-L ET AL: "Fast simulation of ultrasound images from a CT volume", COMPUTERS IN BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 39, no. 2, 1 February 2009 (2009-02-01), pages 180 - 186, XP025940785, ISSN: 0010-4825, [retrieved on 20090131], DOI: 10.1016/J.COMPBIOMED.2008.12.009
- [XP] DIMITRE HRISTOV: "Real-Time Telerobotic 3D Ultrasound for Soft-Tissue Guidance Concurrent with Beam Delivery", AAPM 54TH ANNUAL MEETING & EXHIBITION; JULY 29 - AUGUST 2, 2012; CHARLOTTE, NC, 29 July 2012 (2012-07-29) - 2 August 2012 (2012-08-02), New York, pages 1 - 11, XP055253090
- See references of WO 2014018983A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014018983 A1 20140130; CN 104869912 A 20150826; EP 2877097 A1 20150603; EP 2877097 A4 20160413; US 10232194 B2 20190319; US 2015209599 A1 20150730
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2013052582 W 20130729; CN 201380050296 A 20130729; EP 13822334 A 20130729; US 201314417480 A 20130729