EP 2899669 A1 20150729 - Lane relative position estimation method and system for driver assistance systems
Title (en)
Lane relative position estimation method and system for driver assistance systems
Title (de)
Verfahren zur fahrspurbezogenen Positionsschätzung und System für Fahrerhilfssysteme
Title (fr)
Procédé d'estimation de position relative de voie et système pour systèmes d'assistance au conducteur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 14152164 A 20140122
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a system and method for lane relative position estimation, wherein first the environment of a vehicle is sensed with at least one sensor means (1); then spatial features from information obtained from the sensor means (1) are extracted which are then classified. The spatial features capture lateral position information within a lane and an output signal including the result of the classification which represents the relative lateral positioning of a road location with respect to the overall lane shape is generated.
IPC 8 full level
G06K 9/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B60W 30/12 (2013.01 - US); G06V 20/588 (2022.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 6212453 B1 20010403 - KAWAGOE HIROYUKI [JP], et al
- US 2007198146 A1 20070823 - IKEDA TETSUO [JP], et al
- JP 2007004669 A 20070111 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD
- US 2011044503 A1 20110224 - SATO HIDENORI [JP]
- US 2011063097 A1 20110317 - NAKA TAKUYA [JP], et al
- US 2011187863 A1 20110804 - GLANDER KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al
- US 7151996 B2 20061219 - STEIN GIDEON P [IL]
- WO 2012126650 A1 20120927 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al
- EP 2574958 A1 20130403 - HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE]
- EP 2574958 A1 20130403 - HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE]
- D. TOEPFER; J. SPEHR; J. EFFERTZ; C. STILLER: "Efficient Scene Understanding for Intelligent Vehicles Using a Part-Based Road Representation", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 2013
Citation (search report)
- [ID] EP 2574958 A1 20130403 - HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE]
- [Y] US 2012253602 A1 20121004 - FUJITA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al
- [XYI] NICHOLAS APOSTOLOFF: "Vision based lane tracking using multiple cues and particle filtering", 2 August 2004 (2004-08-02), pages 1 - 170, XP055117978, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.72.1911&rep=rep1&type=pdf> [retrieved on 20140514]
- [XY] TOBIAS KÜHNL: "Road Terrain Detection forAdvanced Driver Assistance Systems", 21 May 2013, TECHNISCHEN FAKULTÄT DER UNIVERSITÄT BIELEFELD, pages: 1 - 152, XP055117968
- [Y] WEIGEL H ET AL: "Vehicle tracking with lane assignment by camera and lidar sensor fusion", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 2009 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 3 June 2009 (2009-06-03), pages 513 - 520, XP031489894, ISBN: 978-1-4244-3503-6
- [AP] AHARON BAR HILLEL ET AL: "Recent progress in road and lane detection: a survey", MACHINE VISION AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 25, no. 3, 1 April 2014 (2014-04-01), pages 727 - 745, XP055113665, ISSN: 0932-8092, DOI: 10.1007/s00138-011-0404-2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2899669 A1 20150729; JP 2015138552 A 20150730; JP 6202635 B2 20170927; US 2015203114 A1 20150723; US 9352746 B2 20160531
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 14152164 A 20140122; JP 2015004851 A 20150114; US 201514601584 A 20150121