Global Patent Index - EP 2904697 A4

EP 2904697 A4 2017-05-10 - ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT FOR POWERING CONSUMER ELECTRONIC DEVICES

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT FOR POWERING CONSUMER ELECTRONIC DEVICES

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNG ZUR STROMVERSORGUNG VON UNTERHALTUNGSELEKTRONIKVORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT ÉLECTRIQUE POUR ALIMENTER DES DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES GRAND PUBLIC

Publication

EP 2904697 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 14851424 A

Priority

  • US 201361896557 P
  • US 201461949171 P
  • US 2014062740 W

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/14 (2006.01); H02M 1/08 (2006.01); H02M 3/158 (2006.01); H02M 3/335 (2006.01); H02M 7/02 (2006.01); H02M 7/04 (2006.01); H02M 1/00 (2007.01); H02M 3/07 (2006.01); H02M 3/157 (2006.01); H02M 7/483 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/33546 (2013.01); H02M 3/07 (2013.01); H02M 3/157 (2013.01); H02M 2001/0025 (2013.01); H02M 2001/0032 (2013.01); H02M 2001/007 (2013.01); Y02B 70/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] CN 102801329 A 20121128 - SILERGY SEMICONDUCTOR TECHNOLOGY TONGZHOU CO LTD & US 2014043866 A1 20140213 - ZHAO CHEN [CN], et al
  • [XA] US 2013234785 A1 20130912 - DAI HEPING [US], et al
  • [A] US 2009072800 A1 20090319 - RAMADASS YOGESH K [US], et al
  • [A] US 2009322304 A1 20091231 - ORAW BRADLEY S [US], et al
  • [A] US 2011050170 A1 20110303 - EASTLACK JEFFREY R [US]
  • [I] TSAI-FU WU ET AL: "Modeling of Single-Stage Converters With High Power Factor and Fast Regulation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 46, no. 3, 1 June 1999 (1999-06-01), XP011023537, ISSN: 0278-0046
  • [A] ZHU J Y ET AL: "Control loop design for two-stage DC-DC converters with low voltage/high current output", APEC 2003. 18TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. MIAMI BEACH, FL, FEB. 9 - 13, 2003; [ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, 9 February 2003 (2003-02-09), pages 859 - 865vol.2, XP032156001, ISBN: 978-0-7803-7768-4, DOI: 10.1109/APEC.2003.1179317
  • See also references of WO 2015066087A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2904697 A1 20150812; EP 2904697 A4 20170510

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171107

2017-05-10 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170407

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 1/00 20070101ALN20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 7/04 20060101ALI20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 1/08 20060101ALI20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 7/483 20070101ALN20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 7/02 20060101ALI20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 1/14 20060101AFI20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 3/158 20060101ALI20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 3/07 20060101ALN20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 3/157 20060101ALN20170403BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02M 3/335 20060101ALI20170403BHEP

2017-02-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2015-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME