EP 2922039 B1 20210224 - EMERGENCY LIGHT SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD
Title (en)
EMERGENCY LIGHT SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD
Title (de)
NOTLICHTSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN
Title (fr)
SYSTÈME LUMINEUX DE SECOURS ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102014004170 A 20140321
IPC 8 full level
G08B 7/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G08B 7/066 (2013.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : RP-Technik GmbH
- DE 102014004170 A1 20150924 - CEAG NOTLICHTSYSTEME GMBH [DE]
- EP 2922039 A2 20150923 - CEAG NOTLICHTSYSTEME GMBH [DE]
- DE 102006014012 A1 20071011 - HO ETHAN [TW]
- JP 2008225630 A 20080925 - NEC CORP
- US 2006226970 A1 20061012 - SAGA SUSUMU [JP], et al
- US 2012242483 A1 20120927 - KUO CHE-MING [TW], et al
- US 2009138353 A1 20090528 - MENDELSON EHUD [US]
- EP 2620923 A2 20130731 - ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]
- US 2013285558 A1 20131031 - RECKER MICHAEL V [US], et al
- US 2009243845 A1 20091001 - KAGAWA NORIAKI [JP]
- EP 2763112 A2 20140806 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- DE 102013200815 A1 20140724 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- CN 102970413 A 20130313 - GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM
- CN 101556158 A 20091014 - INVENTEC SHANGHAI APPLIANCES [CN]
- KR 20130094876 A 20130827 - LEE JIN SUK [KR]
- US 2009297157 A1 20091203 - NAKAGAWA MASAO [JP]
- US 7605696 B2 20091020 - QUATRO CARY [US]
- US 2013116922 A1 20130509 - CAI YI-WEN [TW], et al
- JP 2013164695 A 20130822 - MOGI OSAMU, et al
- DE 202012104642 U1 20130116 - INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH [DE]
- KR 20060081555 A 20060713 - LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]
- KR 20110032304 A 20110330 - IUCF HYU [KR]
- ANONYMOUS: "Bluetooth", WIKIPEDIA, 21 September 2021 (2021-09-21), XP055874885, [retrieved on 20211220]
- ANONYMOUS: "Apple iPhone 4s Daten ", INSIDE-DIGITAL.DE, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), XP055874899, [retrieved on 20211220]
- ANONYMOUS: "Samsung Galaxy Note 4", LTE-ANBIETER.INFO, 1 October 2014 (2014-10-01), XP055874903, [retrieved on 20211220]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2922039 A2 20150923; EP 2922039 A3 20151007; EP 2922039 B1 20210224; DE 102014004170 A1 20150924
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 15000735 A 20150312; DE 102014004170 A 20140321