Global Patent Index - EP 2925947 B1

EP 2925947 B1 2017-10-11 - ROLLER SHUTTER HAVING A DOOR LEAF IN THE FORM OF A FLEXIBLE CURTAIN

Title (en)

ROLLER SHUTTER HAVING A DOOR LEAF IN THE FORM OF A FLEXIBLE CURTAIN

Title (de)

ROLLTOR MIT EINEM TORBLATT IN GESTALT EINES FLEXIBLEN BEHANGS

Title (fr)

PORTE ROULANTE PRÉSENTANT UN VANTAIL EN FORME DE RIDEAU SOUPLE

Publication

EP 2925947 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 13752632 A

Priority

  • DE 102012111611 A
  • EP 2013067473 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2014082764A1] The invention relates to a roller shutter (100), in particular a high-speed roller shutter, having: a door leaf (110) in the form of a flexible curtain, lateral guides, in which lateral edges of the door leaf (110) are received, and a drive (140) which generates a driving force for driving the door leaf (110), wherein the door leaf (110) has an elastically designed terminating element (112) on a forward edge, which tensions the lateral guides by means of laterally attached transverse force components. Said roller shutter (100) is in particular characterized in that the driving force of the drive (140) engages on the terminating element (112) of the door leaf (110) and provides the laterally attached transverse force components for tensioning the terminating element (112) of the door leaf (110) and a tension force component, substantially directed in the movement direction of the door leaf (110), for closing the door leaf (110). An improved roller shutter (100) is thus achieved, which has high operational reliability and represents less danger to people or objects in cases of collision.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/13 (2006.01); E06B 9/58 (2006.01); E06B 9/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/70 (2013.01); E05F 15/41 (2013.01); E05F 15/686 (2013.01); E05F 15/70 (2013.01); E06B 9/13 (2013.01); E06B 9/58 (2013.01); E06B 9/581 (2013.01); E06B 9/62 (2013.01); E06B 9/80 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/11 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6836 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6845 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2014082764 A1 20140605; AU 2013351491 A1 20150604; AU 2013351491 B2 20160428; CA 2890825 A1 20140605; CA 2890825 C 20171114; CN 104822892 A 20150805; CN 104822892 B 20170825; DE 102012111611 A1 20140605; DE 102012111611 A8 20140731; DK 2925947 T3 20180102; EA 028318 B1 20171130; EA 201591035 A1 20150930; EP 2925947 A1 20151007; EP 2925947 B1 20171011; ES 2645492 T3 20171205; HU E035437 T2 20180502; IL 238399 A 20180731; IL 238399 D0 20150630; JP 2016502001 A 20160121; JP 6063057 B2 20170118; MX 2015005300 A 20151009; PL 2925947 T3 20180430; PT 2925947 T 20180111; SI 2925947 T1 20180131; US 2015337594 A1 20151126; US 9840869 B2 20171212

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 SM] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502013008559

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180211

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-02 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E035437

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20170402941

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-26 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-01-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-01-17 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-11 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Document: PT 2925947 T 20180111

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-01-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20171219

2017-12-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2645492 T3

- Effective date: 20171205

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013008559

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936209 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG, CH

2017-10-19 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-08-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170721

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170713

2017-01-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161223

2016-03-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2015-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-10-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME