EP 2926560 A4 20161026 - JCTVC-L0227: VPS_EXTENSION WITH UPDATES OF PROFILE-TIER-LEVEL SYNTAX STRUCTURE
Title (en)
JCTVC-L0227: VPS_EXTENSION WITH UPDATES OF PROFILE-TIER-LEVEL SYNTAX STRUCTURE
Title (de)
JCTVC-L0227: VPS-ERWEITERUNG MIT AKTUALISIERUNGEN DER PROFIL-STUFE-EBENE-SYNTAXSTRUKTUR
Title (fr)
JCTVC-L0227: STRUCTURE SYNTAXIQUE VPS_EXTENSION AVEC MISES À JOUR DE LA STRUCTURE SYNTAXIQUE PROFILE_TIER_LEVEL
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201361748878 P 20130104
- US 201314035740 A 20130924
- US 2013076225 W 20131218
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2014107312A1] The profile_tier_level syntax structure of a High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) syntax structure is updated to provide more flexibility for use in the vps_extension() syntax structure for use in each layer or operating point. A new flag 'LevelPresentFlag' is added in profile_tier_level syntax structure to support the variance of Level parameters separately from the Profile/Tier Paremeter. The update to the profile_tier_level syntax structure provides flexibility in selecting profile_tier and level parameters for HEVC selections in scalable video coding, multi-view coding and 3D video coding areas.
IPC 8 full level
H04N 19/30 (2014.01); H04N 19/70 (2014.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
H04N 19/157 (2014.11 - KR); H04N 19/30 (2014.11 - EP); H04N 19/423 (2014.11 - KR); H04N 19/597 (2014.11 - EP); H04N 19/70 (2014.11 - EP KR)
Citation (search report)
- [XP] HAQUE M: "VPS extension with updates of profile-tier-level syntax structure", 12. JCT-VC MEETING; 103. MPEG MEETING; 14-1-2013 - 23-1-2013; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, no. JCTVC-L0227, 8 January 2013 (2013-01-08), XP030113715
- [XI] BOYCE J ET AL: "SEI Message for profile and level signaling for temporal scalability and extensions", 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, no. m25572, 12 July 2012 (2012-07-12), XP030053906
- [XI] Y-K WANG (QUALCOMM): "BoG on high-level syntax for extension planning", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, no. JCT3V-A0177, 20 July 2012 (2012-07-20), XP030130176
- [XI] CHEN Y ET AL: "3D-HLS: Video parameter set for 3D-HEVC", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, no. JCT3V-A0099, 11 July 2012 (2012-07-11), XP030130098
- See references of WO 2014107312A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014107312 A1 20140710; CN 104904211 A 20150909; CN 104904211 B 20180612; CN 108337520 A 20180727; EP 2926560 A1 20151007; EP 2926560 A4 20161026; JP 2016508332 A 20160317; JP 2017153087 A 20170831; JP 6107970 B2 20170405; JP 6399125 B2 20181003; KR 101710290 B1 20170224; KR 102000373 B1 20190715; KR 20150092250 A 20150812; KR 20170021908 A 20170228
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2013076225 W 20131218; CN 201380069289 A 20131218; CN 201810288114 A 20131218; EP 13870094 A 20131218; JP 2015551696 A 20131218; JP 2017042687 A 20170307; KR 20157017673 A 20131218; KR 20177004602 A 20131218