Global Patent Index - EP 2927348 B1

EP 2927348 B1 2017-10-25 - CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING CORROSION OF METAL BORDERS OF A SAW IN CONTACT WITH WOOD TO BE CUT

Title (en)

CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING CORROSION OF METAL BORDERS OF A SAW IN CONTACT WITH WOOD TO BE CUT

Title (de)

KORROSIONSSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN DER KORROSION VON METALLISCHEN SICH IN KONTAKT MIT ZU ZERKLEINERNDEM HOLZ BEFINDLICHEN ELEMENTEN EINER SÄGE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ÉVITER LA CORROSION DES ÉLÉMENTS MÉTALLIQUES D'UNE SCIE EN CONTACT AVEC LE BOIS À COUPER

Publication

EP 2927348 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 15450016 A

Priority

  • AT 15014 U
  • AT 34114 U

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 15/00 (2006.01); C10M 125/10 (2006.01); C10M 129/34 (2006.01); C10M 133/04 (2006.01); C10M 133/06 (2006.01); C10M 133/12 (2006.01); C10M 133/40 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 15/00 (2013.01); C10M 125/10 (2013.01); C10M 129/34 (2013.01); C10M 133/06 (2013.01); C10M 133/12 (2013.01); C10M 133/40 (2013.01); C10M 133/44 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2207/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/044 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10N 2230/12 (2013.01); C10N 2240/401 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 2201/062 + C10N 2210/01
  2. C10M 2207/123 + C10N 2210/02

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2927348 A1 20151007; EP 2927348 B1 20171025; AT 14305 U1 20150815

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 4

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-28 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171025

2017-12-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502015002191

2017-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 940032 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-06-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170518

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C23F 15/00 20060101AFI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/04 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/12 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/40 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 125/10 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/44 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 129/34 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2017-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/06 20060101ALI20170427BHEP

2016-04-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160310

2016-04-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-10-07 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2015-10-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME