Global Patent Index - EP 2938628 A4

EP 2938628 A4 20161019 - POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ENDOGLUCANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME

Title (en)

POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ENDOGLUCANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME

Title (de)

POLYPEPTIDE MIT ENDOGLUCANASEAKTIVITÄT UND POLYNUKLEOTIDE ZUR CODIERUNG DAVON

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ D'ENDOGLUCANASE ET POLYNUCLÉOTIDES CODANT POUR CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 2938628 A4 20161019 (EN)

Application

EP 13868583 A 20131224

Priority

  • CN 2012087339 W 20121224
  • CN 2012087336 W 20121224
  • CN 2012087345 W 20121224
  • CN 2013090355 W 20131224

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2014101753A1] Provided are isolated polypeptides having endoglucanase activity, catalytic domains, carbohydrate binding modules and polynucleotides encoding the polypeptides, catalytic domains or carbohydrate binding modules. Also provided are nucleic acid constructs, vectors and host cells comprising the polynucleotides as well as methods of producing and using the polypeptides, catalytic domains or carbohydrate binding modules.

IPC 8 full level

C07K 14/37 (2006.01); C12N 9/46 (2006.01); C12N 15/56 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C07K 14/37 (2013.01); C12N 9/2437 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 2012106824 A1 20120816 - IOGEN BIO PRODUCTS CORP [CA], et al & DATABASE Geneseq [online] 27 September 2012 (2012-09-27), "Neurospora crassa family 45 cellulase subfamily A (Cel45A), SEQ:27.", XP002757334, accession no. GSP:AZY76749 Database accession no. AZY76749 & DATABASE Geneseq [online] 27 September 2012 (2012-09-27), "Thielavia terrestris family 45 cellulase subfamily A (Cel45A), SEQ:22.", XP002757335, accession no. GSP:AZY76744 Database accession no. AZY76744
  • [X] DATABASE Geneseq [online] 16 August 2012 (2012-08-16), "T. terrestris NRRL 8126 GH45 endoglucanase with truncated CBM, SEQ:2.", XP002757336, accession no. GSP:AZX33565 Database accession no. AZX33565 & DATABASE Geneseq [online] 16 August 2012 (2012-08-16), "T. terrestris NRRL 8126 GH45 endoglucanase with fuctional CBM, SEQ ID: 4.", XP002757337, accession no. GSP:AZX33567 Database accession no. AZX33567 & WO 2012089024 A1 20120705 - NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al
  • [X] DATABASE UniProt [online] 16 November 2011 (2011-11-16), "SubName: Full=Glycoside hydrolase family 45 protein {ECO:0000313|EMBL:AEO65930.1};", XP002757338, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:G2R3B9 Database accession no. G2R3B9
  • [A] SHIMONAKA ATSUSHI ET AL: "Specific characteristics of family 45 endoglucanases from mucorales in the use of textiles and laundry", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, vol. 70, no. 4, 1 April 2006 (2006-04-01), pages 1013 - 1016, XP002684954, ISSN: 0916-8451
  • [A] ATSUSHI SHIMONAKA ET AL: "Amino Acid Regions of Family 45 Endoglucanases Involved in Cotton Defibrillation and in Resistance to Anionic Surfactants and Oxidizing Agents", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 70, no. 10, 1 January 2006 (2006-01-01), pages 2460 - 2466, XP055051705, ISSN: 0916-8451, DOI: 10.1271/bbb.60200
  • [A] HENRISSAT B ET AL: "NEW FAMILIES IN THE CLASSIFICATION OF GLYCOSYL HYDROLASES BASED ON AMINO ACID SEQUENCE SIMILARITIES", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS LTD, GB, vol. 293, no. 3, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 781 - 788, XP000869530, ISSN: 0264-6021
  • See also references of WO 2014101753A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2014101753 A1 20140703; BR 112015014624 A2 20171010; EP 2938628 A1 20151104; EP 2938628 A4 20161019

DOCDB simple family (application)

CN 2013090355 W 20131224; BR 112015014624 A 20131224; EP 13868583 A 20131224