EP 2942412 B1 20161116 - FORGED AEROSPACE PRODUCTS FROM LITHIUM-FREE ALUMINIUM ALLOY CONTAINING COPPER MAGNESIUM AND SILVER
Title (en)
FORGED AEROSPACE PRODUCTS FROM LITHIUM-FREE ALUMINIUM ALLOY CONTAINING COPPER MAGNESIUM AND SILVER
Title (de)
GESCHMIEDETE PRODUKTE FÜR DIE RAUMFAHRTINDUSTRIE AUS EINER LITHIUMFREIEN MAGNESIUM-KUPFER-SILBER ENTHALTENDEN ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG
Title (fr)
PRODUITS AÉROSPATIAUX FORGÉS EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM AVEC ARGENT, MAGNÉSIUM ET CUIVRE MAIS SANS LITHIUM
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201461989326 P 20140506
- US 201414461102 A 20140815
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP2942412A1] A substantially lithium-free alloy may comprise copper from 4.8 wt.% to 5.4 wt.%, magnesium from 0.7 wt.% to 1.1 wt.%, silver from 0.55 wt.% to 0.7 wt.%, and lithium at or below 0.005 wt.%. The substantially lithium-free alloy may further comprise silver from 0.56 wt.% to 0.7 wt.%. The substantially lithium-free alloy may also comprise zirconium from 0.08 wt.% to 0.15 wt.%. The substantially lithium-free alloy may include titanium at or below 0.06 wt.%, iron at or below 0.1 wt.%, silicon at or below 0.08 wt.%, beryllium at or below 0.0001 wt.%, chromium at or below 0.05 wt.%, and zinc at or below 0.25 wt.%.
IPC 8 full level
C22C 21/16 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C22C 21/14 (2013.01 - US); C22C 21/16 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 21/18 (2013.01 - US); C22F 1/04 (2013.01 - US); C22F 1/057 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH
- US 5879475 A 19990309 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- US 2007092739 A1 20070426 - STEELE LESLIE S [US], et al
- EP 1281781 A1 20030205 - ALCOA INC [US]
- "Basic textbook", January 1993, article "Aluminum. Properties and Physical Metallurgy", pages: 136 - 137, 231, XP055405781
Opponent : Arconic Inc.
- US 5879475 A 19990309 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- US 5652063 A 19970729 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- STEELE ET AL.: "Aluminum Alloy 2040 for Demandinq Aircraft Wheel Applications", AEROMAT 2006 CONFERENCE & EXPOSITION LIGHT ALLOY TECHNOLOGY SESSION 4, DAMAGE TOLERANT ALUMINUM ALLOY AIRFRAME APPLICATIONS, 18 May 2006 (2006-05-18), XP055411345
- "Aluminum and Aluminum Alloys", ASM SPECIALTY HANDBOOK,, 1993, XP055411353
- "American National Standard Alloy and Temper Designation Systems for Aluminum", THE ALUMINUM ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED, 2009, XP055411360
- ROBERT EDAHL ET AL.: "Effect of Thermal Exposure on the Tensile Properties of Aluminum Alloys for Elevated Temperature Service", NASA, February 2004 (2004-02-01), XP055411369
- L.S. STEELE: "Aluminum Alloy 2040 for Demanding Aircraft Wheel Applications", ARCHIVE 17TH AEROMAT CONFERENCE & EXPOSITION, 15 May 2006 (2006-05-15), XP055411372, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://asm.confex.com/asm/aero06/techproaram/paper 13279.htm>
Opponent : SAFRAN LANDING SYSTEMS
- US 5879475 A 19990309 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- US 5800927 A 19980901 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- WO 2011133248 A2 20111027 - ALCOA INC [US], et al
- EP 1780313 A2 20070502 - GOODRICH CORP [US]
- EP 1281781 A1 20030205 - ALCOA INC [US]
- US 2003026725 A1 20030206 - SAWTELL RALPH R [US], et al
- US 7527872 B2 20090505 - STEELE LESLIE SCOTTE [US], et al
- US 5652063 A 19970729 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- WO 2013186635 A2 20131219 - BOREALIS TECH LTD [GB]
- US 4474060 A 19841002 - CROSSMAN RICHARD L [US]
- CA 2843325 A1 20130221 - FUCHS KG OTTO [DE]
- US 3794531 A 19740226 - MARKWORTH M, et al
- US 2006157172 A1 20060720 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- US 2005115645 A1 20050602 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- US 2011008202 A1 20110113 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- EP 1522600 A1 20050413 - KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]
- WO 2007111634 A2 20071004 - ALCOA INC [US], et al
- JP 2013142168 A 20130722 - FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP
- JP 2001181771 A 20010703 - KOBE STEEL LTD
- GB 1320271 A 19730613 - ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK
- JP H03107440 A 19910507 - SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP
- WO 2004111282 A1 20041223 - CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPROD GMBH [DE], et al
- "International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminum and Wrought Aluminum Alloys", THE ALUMINUM ASSOCIATION TEAL_1_OL_2015, 2009, pages 6, XP055392013
- HATCH, J. E.: "EFFECTS OF ALLOYING ELEMENTS AND IMPURITIES ON PROPERTIES", ALUMINUM : PROPERTIES AND PHYSICAL METALLURGY A511, 04IO, 1984, pages 231, XP055418823
- TOTTEN, G. E. ET AL.: "Totten-MacKenzie Aluminum", HANDBOOK OF ALUMINUM, vol. 1, 2003, New York, pages 686, XP055418827
- J. H. L. VAN LINDEN, ET AL.: "Chemical Impurities in Aluminum", ISBN: 978-1-4613-1013-6, article VAN LINDEN J.H.L. ET AL., pages: 393 - 409, XP055412172
Opponent : Safran Landing Systems
- US 5879475 A 19990309 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- US 5800927 A 19980901 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- WO 2011133248 A2 20111027 - ALCOA INC [US], et al
- EP 1780313 A2 20070502 - GOODRICH CORP [US]
- EP 1281781 A1 20030205 - ALCOA INC [US]
- US 2003026725 A1 20030206 - SAWTELL RALPH R [US], et al
- US 7527872 B2 20090505 - STEELE LESLIE SCOTTE [US], et al
- US 5652063 A 19970729 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
- WO 2013186635 A2 20131219 - BOREALIS TECH LTD [GB]
- US 4474060 A 19841002 - CROSSMAN RICHARD L [US]
- CA 2843325 A1 20130221 - FUCHS KG OTTO [DE]
- US 3794531 A 19740226 - MARKWORTH M, et al
- US 2006157172 A1 20060720 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- US 2005115645 A1 20050602 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- US 2011008202 A1 20110113 - FISCHER GERNOT [DE], et al
- EP 1522600 A1 20050413 - KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]
- WO 2007111634 A2 20071004 - ALCOA INC [US], et al
- JP 2013142168 A 20130722 - FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP
- JP 2001181771 A 20010703 - KOBE STEEL LTD
- GB 1320271 A 19730613 - ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK
- JP H03107440 A 19910507 - SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP
- WO 2004111282 A1 20041223 - CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPROD GMBH [DE], et al
- "International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminum and Wrought Aluminum Alloys", THE ALUMINIUM ASSOCIATION, pages 1 - 38, XP055562328
- HATCH, J. E.: "EFFECTS OF ALLOYING ELEMENTS AND IMPURITIES ON PROPERTIES", ALUMINUM : PROPERTIES AND PHYSICAL METALLURGY A511, 04IO, pages 231, XP055562338
- TOTTEN, G. E. ET AL.: "Totten-MacKenzie Aluminum (2003)", HANDBOOK OF ALUMINUM, vol. 1, 2003, New York, pages 686, XP055562340
- KATZ SEYMOUR, LANDEFELD CRAIG F.: "Foundry Processes", 1988, SPRINGER US, Boston, MA, ISBN: 978-1-4613-1013-6, article VAN LINDEN J.H.L. ET AL.: "Chemical Impurities in Aluminum", pages: 393 - 409, XP055562345
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2942412 A1 20151111; EP 2942412 B1 20161116; CA 2886124 A1 20151106; RU 2015116924 A 20161127; RU 2015116924 A3 20181102; US 2015322556 A1 20151112
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 15166597 A 20150506; CA 2886124 A 20150323; RU 2015116924 A 20150505; US 201414461102 A 20140815