EP 2945646 A4 20160921 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR INHIBITORS
Title (en)
ESTROGEN RECEPTOR INHIBITORS
Title (de)
ÖSTROGENREZEPTORINHIBITOREN
Title (fr)
INHIBITEURS D'UN RÉCEPTEUR DES STROGÈNES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201361754292 P 20130118
- US 2014012405 W 20140121
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2014113820A1] A method of treating ERα positive cancer comprising administering to a patient in need thereof an effective amount of a small molecule inhibitor or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, wherein the small molecule inhibitor acts through estrogen receptor a and activates one or more of the three arms of the unfolded protein response pathway (UPR) is provided.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/337 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/4196 (2006.01); A61K 31/4535 (2006.01); A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 31/5685 (2006.01); A61K 33/24 (2006.01); A61K 33/243 (2019.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 31/138 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/337 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/404 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/4196 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/4535 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/565 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/5685 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 33/243 (2018.12 - EP US); A61K 45/06 (2013.01 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2017.12 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 2007299102 A1 20071227 - FELDING JAKOB [DK], et al
- [A] US 4053483 A 19771011 - HOSTA PUJOL ALFONSO, et al
- [XY] UDDIN ET AL: "Syntheses and antiproliferative evaluation of oxyphenisatin derivatives", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 17, no. 10, 27 April 2007 (2007-04-27), pages 2854 - 2857, XP022049601, ISSN: 0960-894X, DOI: 10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.02.060
- [Y] NATARAJAN A ET AL: "3,3-diaryl-1,3-dihydroindol-2-ones as antiproliferatives mediated by translation initiation inhibition", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 47, no. 8, 9 March 2004 (2004-03-09), pages 1882 - 1885, XP002347248, ISSN: 0022-2623, DOI: 10.1021/JM0499716
- [Y] JENSEN METTE MUNK ET AL: "Early detection of response to experimental chemotherapeutic Top216 with [18F]FLT and [18F]FDG PET in human ovary cancer xenografts in mice", PLOS ONE, vol. 5, no. 9, E12965, September 2010 (2010-09-01), pages 1 - 9, XP002760518, ISSN: 1932-6203
- See references of WO 2014113820A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014113820 A1 20140724; AU 2014207272 A1 20150730; CA 2898732 A1 20140724; EP 2945646 A1 20151125; EP 2945646 A4 20160921; IL 240019 A0 20150924
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2014012405 W 20140121; AU 2014207272 A 20140121; CA 2898732 A 20140121; EP 14740515 A 20140121; IL 24001915 A 20150719