EP 2952522 A1 20151209 - Stabilized p53 peptides and uses thereof
Title (en)
Stabilized p53 peptides and uses thereof
Title (de)
Stabilisierte P53-Peptide und deren Verwendungen
Title (fr)
Peptides p53 stabilisés et leurs utilisations
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 88752607 P 20070131
- EP 08728649 A 20080131
- US 2008052580 W 20080131
Abstract (en)
Cross-linked peptides related to human p53 and bind to HMD2 or a family member of HDM2 useful for promoting apoptosis, e.g., in the treatment of and identifying therapeutic agents that binding to HMD2 or a family member of HDM2.
IPC 8 full level
C07K 7/54 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61P 35/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 35/02 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 35/04 (2017.12 - EP); C07K 1/113 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 14/4746 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 38/00 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- WO 9934833 A1 19990715 - SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC [US], et al
- WO 9914259 A1 19990325 - SHEARWATER POLYMERS [US], et al
- US 6348558 B1 20020219 - HARRIS J MILTON [US], et al
- US 5446090 A 19950829 - HARRIS J MILTON [US]
- WILLIAMS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 113, 1991, pages 9276
- SCHAFINEISTER ET AL., J AM. CHEM SOC., vol. 122, 2000, pages 5891
- R. LAROCK: "Comprehensive Organic Transformations", 1989, VCH PUBLISHERS
- T.W. GREENE; P.G.M. WUTS: "Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis", 1999, JOHN WILEY AND SONS
- L. FIESER; M. FIESER: "Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis", 1994, JOHN WILEY AND SONS
- "Encyclopedia of Reagents for Organic Synthesis", 1995, JOHN WILEY AND SONS
- FIELDS ET AL.: "Synthetic Peptides: A User's Guide", 1992, W. H. FREEMAN & CO., pages: 77
- VAICKUS, L., CRIT REV. IN ONCOL./HEMOTOL., vol. 11, 1991, pages 267 - 97
- KASTAN, M. B.; ONYEKWERE, 0.; SIDRANSKY, D.; VOGELSTEIN, B.; CRAIG, R. W., CANCER RES., vol. 51, 1991, pages 6304 6311
- WU, X.; BAYLE, J. H.; OLSON, D.; LEVINE, A. J., GENES DEV., vol. 7, 1993, pages 1126 - 1132
- YONISH-ROUACH, E.; RESNFTZKY, D.; LOTEM, J.; SACHS, L.; KIMCHI, A.; OREN, M., NATURE, vol. 352, 1991, pages 345 - 347
- MOMAND, J.; ZAMBETTI, G. P.; OLSON, D. C.; GEORGE, D.; LEVINE, A. J., CELL, vol. 69, 1992, pages 1237
- LEVINE, A. J.; HU, W.; FENG, Z., CELL DEATH DIFFER, vol. 13, 2006, pages 1027
- HONDA, R.; TANAKA, H.; YASUDA, H., FEBS LETT., vol. 420, 1997, pages 25
- TAO, W.; LEVINE, A. J., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., vol. 96, 1999, pages 3077 - 3080
- LI, M.; BROOKS, C. L.; WU BAER, F.; CHEN, D.; BAER, R.; GU, W., SCIENCE, vol. 302, 2003, pages 1972 - 1975
- HOLLSTEIN, M.; SIDRANSKY, D.; VOGELSTEIN, B.; HARRIS, C. C., SCIENCE, vol. 253, 1991, pages 49 - 53
- CHENE, P., NAT. REV. CANCER, vol. 3, 2003, pages 102 - 109
- TOLEDO, F.; WAHL, G.M., INT. J. BIOCHEM. CELL BIOL., vol. 39, 2007, pages 1476 - 82
- KUSSIE, P. H.; GORINA, S.; MARECHAL, V.; ELENBAAS, B.; MOREAU, J.; LEVINE, A. J.; PAVLETICH, N. P., SCIENCE, vol. 274, 1996, pages 948 - 953
- SAKURAI, K.; CHUNG, H. S.; KAHNE, D., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 126, 2004, pages 16288 - 16289
- VASSILEV, L. T.; VU, B. T.; GRAVES, B.; CARVAJAL, D.; PODLASKI, F.; FILIPOVIC, Z.; KONG, N.; KAMMLOTT, U.; LUKACS, C.; KLEIN, C., SCIENCE, vol. 303, 2004, pages 844 - 848
- LIN, J.; CHEN, J.; ELENBAAS, B.; LEVINE, A. J., GENES DEV., vol. 8, 1994, pages 1235 - 1246
- SCHAFINEISTER, C. E.; PO, J.; VERDINE, G. L., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 122, 2000, pages 5891 - 5892
- WALENSKY, L.D.; KUNG, A.L.; ESCHER, I.; MALIA, T.J.; BARBUTO, S.; WRIGHT, R.D.; WAGNER, G.; VERDINE,G.L.; KORSMEYER, S.J., SCIENCE, vol. 305, 2004, pages 1466 - 1470
- VIVÈS, E.; LEBLEU, B.: "Cell-Penetrating Peptides: Processes and Applications", 2002, CRC PRESS, article "The Tat-Derived Cell-Penetrating Peptide", pages: 3 - 21
- ZHANG, Y.; XIONG, Y., SCIENCE, vol. 292, 2001, pages 1910 - 1915
- BARAK, Y.; JUVEN, T.; HAFFNER, R.; OREN, M., EMBO J., vol. 12, 1993, pages 461 - 468
- JUVEN, T.; BARAK, Y.; ZAUBERMAN, A.; GEORGE, D. L.; OREN, M., ONCOGENE, vol. 8, 1993, pages 3411 - 3416
- DULIC, V.; KAUFINANN, W. K.; WILSON, S. J.; TISTY, T. D.; LEES, E.; HARPER, J. W.; ELLEDGE, S. J.; REED, S. I., CELL, vol. 76, 1994, pages 1013
- EL-D.EIRY, W. S.; TOKINO, T.; VELCULESCU, V. E.; LEVY, D. B.; PARSONS, R.; TRENT, J. M.; LIN, D.; MERCER, W. E.; KINZLER, K. W.; V, CELL, vol. 75, 1993, pages 817
- POCHAMPALLY, R.; FODERA, B.; CHEN, L.; LU, W.; CHEN, J., J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 274, 1999, pages 15271 - 15277
- DUNCAN, S. J.; GRUSCHOW, S.; WILLIAMS, D. H.; MCNICHOLAS, C.; PUREWAL, R.; HAJEK, M.; GERLITZ, M.; MARTIN, S.; WRIGLEY, S. K.; MOO, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 123, 2001, pages 554 - 560
- CHÈNE, P.; FUCHS, J.; BOHN,. J.; GARCIA-ECHEVERRIA, C.; FURET, P.; FABBRO, D., J. MOL. BIOL., vol. 299, 2000, pages 245
- SAKURAI, K.; SCHUBERT, C.; KAHNE, D., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 1 8, 2006, pages 11000 - 11001
- KRITZER, J. A.; HODSDON, M. E.; SCHEPARTZ, A., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. L27, 2005, pages 4118 - 4119
- KRITZER, J. A.; LEAR, J. D.; HODSDON, M. E.; SCHEPARTZ, A., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 126, 2004, pages 9468 - 9469
- WASYLYK, C.; SALVI, R.; ARGENTINI, M.; DUREUIL, C.; DELUMEAU, I.; ABECASSIS, J.; DEBUSSCHE, L.; WASYLYK, B., ONCOGENE, vol. 18, 1999, pages 1921 - 1934
- GARCIA-ECHEVERRIA, C.; CHENE, P.; BLOMMERS, M. J. J.; FURCT, P., J. MED. CHEM., vol. 43, 2000, pages 3205 - 3208
- GRASBERGER, B. L. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., vol. 48, 2005, pages 909 - 912
Citation (search report)
- [Y] WO 2005118620 A2 20051215 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
- [A] WO 2005040202 A2 20050506 - APLAGEN GMBH [DE], et al
- [E] WO 2008061192 A2 20080522 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC, et al
- [Y] WO 2005044839 A2 20050519 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al
- [X] US 2006008848 A1 20060112 - VERDINE GREGORY L [US], et al
- [Y] WALENSKY L D ET AL: "Activation of apoptosis in vivo by a hydrocarbon-stapled BH3 helix", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 305, 1 January 2004 (2004-01-01), pages 1466 - 1470, XP002491411, ISSN: 0036-8075, DOI: 10.1126/SCIENCE.1099191
- [Y] WALENSKY LOREN D ET AL: "A stapled BID BH3 helix directly binds and activates BAX", MOLECULAR CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, vol. 24, no. 2, 20 October 2006 (2006-10-20), pages 199 - 210, XP009107957, ISSN: 1097-2765, DOI: 10.1016/J.MOLCEL.2006.08.020
- [XP] BERNAL FEDERICO ET AL: "Reactivation of the p53 tumor suppressor pathway by a stapled p53 peptide", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 129, no. 9, 7 February 2007 (2007-02-07), pages 2456 - 2457, XP009107955, ISSN: 0002-7863, DOI: 10.1021/JA0693587
- [A] PICKSLEY S M ET AL: "IMMUNOCHEMICAL ANALYSIS OF THE INTERACTION OF P53 WITH MDM2; - FINEMAPPING OF THE MDM2 BINDING SITE ON P53 USING SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 9, 1 January 1994 (1994-01-01), pages 2523 - 2529, XP002058480, ISSN: 0950-9232
- [Y] UESUGI M ET AL: "The alpha-helical FXXPhiPhi motif in p53: TAF interaction and discrimination by MDM2.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 21 DEC 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10611293, vol. 96, no. 26, 21 December 1999 (1999-12-21), pages 14801 - 14806, XP009144947, ISSN: 0027-8424
- [L] SOHEE BAEK ET AL: "Structure of the Stapled p53 Peptide Bound to Mdm2", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 134, no. 1, 11 January 2012 (2012-01-11), US, pages 103 - 106, XP055223810, ISSN: 0002-7863, DOI: 10.1021/ja2090367
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2008095063 A1 20080807; AU 2008210434 A1 20080807; AU 2008210434 A8 20091217; AU 2008210434 B2 20130620; AU 2008210434 C1 20131114; AU 2008210434 C8 20140327; AU 2008210434 C9 20131212; CA 2677045 A1 20080807; CA 2677045 C 20161018; CA 2939778 A1 20080807; CA 2939778 C 20190129; DK 2118123 T3 20160125; EP 2118123 A1 20091118; EP 2118123 A4 20110420; EP 2118123 B1 20151014; EP 2952522 A1 20151209; EP 2952522 B1 20191030; ES 2558928 T3 20160209; JP 2010518017 A 20100527; JP 2014224121 A 20141204; JP 2017039701 A 20170223; JP 5649825 B2 20150107; JP 6775344 B2 20201028; PL 2118123 T3 20160630; PT 2118123 E 20160210; US 10202431 B2 20190212; US 2010168388 A1 20100701; US 2015119551 A1 20150430; US 2017081379 A1 20170323; US 8889632 B2 20141118; US 9527896 B2 20161227
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2008052580 W 20080131; AU 2008210434 A 20080131; CA 2677045 A 20080131; CA 2939778 A 20080131; DK 08728649 T 20080131; EP 08728649 A 20080131; EP 15154235 A 20080131; ES 08728649 T 20080131; JP 2009548441 A 20080131; JP 2014137588 A 20140703; JP 2016145368 A 20160725; PL 08728649 T 20080131; PT 08728649 T 20080131; US 201414483905 A 20140911; US 201615352911 A 20161116; US 52512308 A 20080131