Global Patent Index - EP 2963171 B1

EP 2963171 B1 2017-10-11 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TEXTILE GRID AND INSTALLATION AND RELATED EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TEXTILE GRID AND INSTALLATION AND RELATED EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES TEXTILGITTERS, UND ANLAGE UND ENTSPRECHENDE MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GRILLE TEXTILE, SON INSTALLATION ET MATÉRIELS RELATIFS

Publication

EP 2963171 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 15175099 A

Priority

FR 1456340 A

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/04 (2012.01); D04H 3/045 (2012.01); D04H 3/07 (2012.01); D04H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/04 (2013.01); D04H 3/045 (2013.01); D04H 3/07 (2013.01); D04H 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2963171 A1 20160106; EP 2963171 B1 20171011; ES 2649158 T3 20180110; FR 3023303 A1 20160108

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 4

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180211

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 936112 T

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-01-24 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-10 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2649158 T3

- Effective date: 20180110

2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602015005249

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936112 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2017-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD AND SIEDSMA AG, CH

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-04-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170329

2016-11-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161011

2016-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-08-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-01-06 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2016-01-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME