EP 2971288 A4 20161207 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS, AND COMPUTER SYSTEMS RELATED TO MAKING AND ADMINISTERING MODIFIED T CELLS
Title (en)
COMPOSITIONS, METHODS, AND COMPUTER SYSTEMS RELATED TO MAKING AND ADMINISTERING MODIFIED T CELLS
Title (de)
ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND RECHNERSYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERABREICHUNG MODIFIZIERTER T-ZELLEN
Title (fr)
COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES INFORMATIQUES ASSOCIÉS À LA PRODUCTION ET L'ADMINISTRATION DE LYMPHOCYTES T MODIFIÉS
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201313804224 A 20130314
- US 201313826803 A 20130314
- US 201313827960 A 20130314
- US 2014023650 W 20140311
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2014159435A1] Embodiments described herein relate to methods, devices, and computer systems thereof for the derivation of T CAR libraries (Universal Subject or Individual Subject) for personalized treatment of disease in a subject. In certain embodiments, differential screening of normal and diseased tissue expression data is utilized to determine disease-specific antigens and thereby generate T CAR cells reactive to such antigens to form a disease-specific library. In certain embodiments, determination of the most effective T CAR clones from the disease-specific library is based on the subject's own disease-specific antigens. In certain embodiments, a subject is treated with a therapeutically effective amount of T CAR clones.
IPC 8 full level
C40B 40/02 (2006.01); C12N 5/0783 (2010.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G16B 20/00 (2019.01); G16B 20/20 (2019.01); G16B 20/30 (2019.01); G16B 25/10 (2019.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 39/4611 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/4631 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/464404 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/464406 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/46447 (2023.05 - EP); G16B 20/00 (2019.02 - EP US); G16B 20/20 (2019.02 - EP US); G16B 20/30 (2019.02 - EP US); G16B 25/10 (2019.02 - EP US); A61K 2239/29 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 2239/38 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 2239/49 (2023.05 - EP); G16B 25/00 (2019.02 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [YD] US 2007036773 A1 20070215 - COOPER LAURENCE [US], et al
- [YD] US 5601819 A 19970211 - WONG JOHNSON T [US], et al
- [Y] SCOTT WILKIE ET AL: "Dual Targeting of ErbB2 and MUC1 in Breast Cancer Using Chimeric Antigen Receptors Engineered to Provide Complementary Signaling", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, vol. 32, no. 5, 17 April 2012 (2012-04-17), pages 1059 - 1070, XP035113362, ISSN: 1573-2592, DOI: 10.1007/S10875-012-9689-9
- [Y] CHRISTOPHER C KLOSS ET AL: "Combinatorial antigen recognition with balanced signaling promotes selective tumor eradication by engineered T cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 31, no. 1, 16 December 2012 (2012-12-16), pages 71 - 75, XP055130697, ISSN: 1087-0156, DOI: 10.1038/nbt.2459
- [Y] KEN-ICHI HANADA ET AL: "nature biotechnology volume 31 number 1 JAnuArY 2013 33", 1 January 2013 (2013-01-01), XP055290041, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.nature.com/nbt/journal/v31/n1/pdf/nbt.2471.pdf> [retrieved on 20160720]
- [Y] CAMERON J TURTLE ET AL: "Engineered T cells for anti-cancer therapy", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY., vol. 24, no. 5, 18 July 2012 (2012-07-18), GB, pages 633 - 639, XP055272888, ISSN: 0952-7915, DOI: 10.1016/j.coi.2012.06.004
- [Y] UTTENTHAL BENJAMIN J ET AL: "Challenges in T cell receptor gene therapy.", THE JOURNAL OF GENE MEDICINE JUN 2012, vol. 14, no. 6, June 2012 (2012-06-01), pages 386 - 399, XP002760096, ISSN: 1521-2254
- See also references of WO 2014159435A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014159435 A1 20141002; EP 2971288 A1 20160120; EP 2971288 A4 20161207
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2014023650 W 20140311; EP 14773595 A 20140311