EP 2973141 A4 20161026 - CYBER SECURITY
Title (en)
CYBER SECURITY
Title (de)
CYBER-SICHERHEIT
Title (fr)
CYBERSÉCURITÉ
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201361789728 P 20130315
- US 2014028575 W 20140314
IPC 8 full level
G06F 21/00 (2013.01); G06F 21/55 (2013.01); G06F 21/57 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G06F 21/55 (2013.01 - US); G06F 21/552 (2013.01 - EP); G06F 21/577 (2013.01 - EP); G06F 2221/034 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] GB 2431255 A 20070418 - MEMEX TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]
- [A] US 2008133288 A1 20080605 - THIBAUX ROMAIN [US], et al
- [A] RAY A ED - CHUA TAT-SENG HE XIANGJIAN LIU WEIFENG PICCARDI MASSIMO WEN YONGGANG TAO DACHENG: "Symbolic dynamic analysis of complex systems for anomaly detection", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 84, no. 7, 1 July 2004 (2004-07-01), pages 1115 - 1130, XP004513234, ISSN: 0165-1684, DOI: 10.1016/J.SIGPRO.2004.03.011
- [A] WENTAO FAN ET AL: "Unsupervised Anomaly Intrusion Detection via Localized Bayesian Feature Selection", DATA MINING (ICDM), 2011 IEEE 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, 11 December 2011 (2011-12-11), pages 1032 - 1037, XP032099936, ISBN: 978-1-4577-2075-8, DOI: 10.1109/ICDM.2011.152
- [A] SOUMALYA SARKAR ET AL: "Symbolic transient time-series analysis for fault detection in aircraft gas turbine engines", AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE (ACC), 2012, IEEE, 27 June 2012 (2012-06-27), pages 5132 - 5137, XP032244687, ISBN: 978-1-4577-1095-7, DOI: 10.1109/ACC.2012.6315253
- [T] COSMA ROHILLA SHALIZI ET AL: "An Algorithm for Pattern Discovery in Time Series", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, 29 October 2002 (2002-10-29), XP080094590
- See references of WO 2014144246A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 14762820 A 20140314