Global Patent Index - EP 2979898 B1

EP 2979898 B1 2017-10-18 - TIRE

Title (en)

TIRE

Title (de)

REIFEN

Title (fr)

PNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 2979898 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 14774573 A

Priority

  • JP 2013074647 A
  • JP 2014056997 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2979898A1] A tire which has a circular tire frame formed of a resin material, and a reinforcing metallic cord member wound around an outer circumferential portion of the tire frame, in which the resin material comprises a polyamide-based thermoplastic elastomer including a soft segment and a hard segment including a structural unit represented by -[CO-(CH 2 ) m -NH]-(wherein m represents an integer of 6 to 11) in a molecule.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); B60C 5/01 (2006.01); B60C 9/14 (2006.01); B60C 9/22 (2006.01); C08G 69/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2013.01); B29D 30/1628 (2013.01); B60C 9/0007 (2013.01); C08G 69/36 (2013.01); C08G 69/40 (2013.01); C08K 3/10 (2013.01); B60C 9/2204 (2013.01); B60C 2001/0083 (2013.01); B60C 2009/207 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2979898 A1 20160203; EP 2979898 A4 20160406; EP 2979898 B1 20171018; CN 105073444 A 20151118; CN 105073444 B 20161019; JP 2014198518 A 20141023; JP 6001488 B2 20161005; US 2016046152 A1 20160218; WO 2014156741 A1 20141002

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602014016053

2017-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 937589 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-05-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170428

2016-07-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2016-04-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60C 9/14 20060101ALI20160303BHEP

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60C 5/01 20060101ALI20160303BHEP

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60C 1/00 20060101AFI20160303BHEP

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60C 9/22 20060101ALI20160303BHEP

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08G 69/40 20060101ALI20160303BHEP

2016-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20151015

2016-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME