Global Patent Index - EP 2984273 B1

EP 2984273 B1 2017-10-11 - METHOD FOR THE CHISEL-LESS FORMATION OF BOREHOLES FOR DEEP BORES AND CHISEL-LESS DRILLING SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE CHISEL-LESS FORMATION OF BOREHOLES FOR DEEP BORES AND CHISEL-LESS DRILLING SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MEISSELLOSEN ERSTELLUNG VON BOHRLÖCHERN FÜR TIEFBOHRUNGEN SOWIE MEISSELLOSES BOHRSYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION SANS BURIN DE TROUS DE FORAGE POUR DES FORAGES PROFONDS ET SYSTÈME DE FORAGE SANS BURIN POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCÉDÉ

Publication

EP 2984273 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 14723976 A

Priority

  • DE 102013005857 A
  • DE 2014000152 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2016053544A1] The invention relates to a method for the chisel-less formation of boreholes for deep bores by means of high-pressure water jet cutting. A chisel-free drilling method that makes substantially continuous drilling operation possible is characterized, according to the invention, by a combination of the processes of high-pressure water jet cutting and high-frequency rock fragmentation. The invention also relates to a chisel-free drilling system for carrying out the method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/18 (2006.01); E21B 7/24 (2006.01); E21B 33/138 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/18 (2013.01); E21B 7/24 (2013.01); E21B 33/138 (2013.01); E21B 47/06 (2013.01); E21B 47/065 (2013.01); E21B 49/003 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102013005857 A1 20141009; EP 2984273 A2 20160217; EP 2984273 B1 20171011; US 2016053544 A1 20160225; WO 2014166467 A2 20141016; WO 2014166467 A3 20150402

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502014005776

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936215 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-06-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170524

2017-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRO4INNOVATION UG

2017-03-22 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20160201

2017-03-22 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20170502

2016-07-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2016-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME