EP 3008665 A4 20170308 - PRESENTING RESULTS OF VISUAL ATTENTION MODELING
Title (en)
PRESENTING RESULTS OF VISUAL ATTENTION MODELING
Title (de)
PRÄSENTATION VON ERGEBNISSEN EINER VISUELLEN AUFMERKSAMKEITSMODELLIERUNG
Title (fr)
PRÉSENTATION DES RÉSULTATS D'UNE MODÉLISATION DE L'ATTENTION VISUELLE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201361834271 P 20130612
- US 2014040440 W 20140602
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2014200742A1] At least some embodiments of the present disclosure feature systems and methods for assessing the impact of visual features within a region of a scene. With the input of a visual representation of a scene and at least one selected region within the scene, the system applies a visual attention model to the visual representation to determine visual conspicuity of the at least one selected region. The system computes feature-related data associated with a plurality of features of the at least one selected region. Based on the visual conspicuity and the feature-related data, the system assesses an impact that at least one of the features within the at least one selected region have on the visual conspicuity.
IPC 8 full level
G06K 9/36 (2006.01); G06V 10/25 (2022.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G06T 7/90 (2016.12 - EP US); G06V 10/25 (2022.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] US 2004120574 A1 20040624 - ROSENHOLTZ RUTH E [US]
- [XI] US 8369652 B1 20130205 - KHOSLA DEEPAK [US], et al
- [A] CA 2804484 A1 20120112 - 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]
- [A] US 2010086200 A1 20100408 - STANKIEWICZ BRIAN J [US], et al
- [A] GB 2417808 A 20060308 - HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]
- [A] US 6320976 B1 20011120 - MURTHY SREERAMA K V [IN], et al
- [I] ITTI L ET AL: "A model of Saliency-based Visual attention for rapid scene analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, vol. 20, no. 11, 1 November 1998 (1998-11-01), pages 1254 - 1259, XP002753706, ISSN: 0162-8828, [retrieved on 20020806], DOI: 10.1109/34.730558
- [XI] YOUNGMIN KIM ET AL: "Saliency-guided Enhancement for Volume Visualization", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, vol. 12, no. 5, 1 September 2006 (2006-09-01), pages 925 - 932, XP011150893, ISSN: 1077-2626, DOI: 10.1109/TVCG.2006.174
- [I] H. JÄNICKE ET AL: "A Salience-based Quality Metric for Visualization", COMPUTER GRAPHICS FORUM, vol. 29, no. 3, 1 June 2010 (2010-06-01), GB, pages 1183 - 1192, XP055340345, ISSN: 0167-7055, DOI: 10.1111/j.1467-8659.2009.01667.x
- [A] YAFENG ZHENG ET AL: "Salient Region Detection Based on Automatic Feature Selection", INTELLIGENT INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY APPLICATION, 2009. IITA 2009. THIRD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 21 November 2009 (2009-11-21), pages 232 - 235, XP031592913, ISBN: 978-0-7695-3859-4
- See references of WO 2014200742A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014200742 A1 20141218; EP 3008665 A1 20160420; EP 3008665 A4 20170308; EP 3992921 A1 20220504; JP 2016530595 A 20160929; JP 6495254 B2 20190403; US 10176396 B2 20190108; US 2016132749 A1 20160512
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2014040440 W 20140602; EP 14810266 A 20140602; EP 21194889 A 20140602; JP 2016519536 A 20140602; US 201414896701 A 20140602