Global Patent Index - EP 3018961 B1

EP 3018961 B1 2017-10-04 - SCHEDULING METHOD, COORDINATED-TRANSMISSION NODE AND CENTRAL COORDINATION NODE FOR DOWNLINK COORDINATED-TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

SCHEDULING METHOD, COORDINATED-TRANSMISSION NODE AND CENTRAL COORDINATION NODE FOR DOWNLINK COORDINATED-TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

ABLAUFPLANUNGSVERFAHREN, KOORDINIERTER ÜBERTRAGUNGSKNOTEN UND ZENTRALER KOORDINATIONSKNOTEN FÜR EINE ABWÄRTSKOORDINIERTEN ÜBERTRAGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PROGRAMMATION, NOEUD D'UNE TRANSMISSION COORDONNÉE ET NOEUD DE COORDINATION CENTRAL POUR UNE TRANSMISSION COORDONNÉE EN LIAISON DESCENDANTE

Publication

EP 3018961 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 14820341 A

Priority

  • CN 201310279724 A
  • CN 2014081558 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP3018961A1] The present disclosure provides a scheduling method, a coordinated-transmission node and a CCN for downlink coordinated-transmission. The scheduling method at a coordinated-transmission node side includes: receiving, by a coordinated-transmission node, scheduling privilege information corresponding to a downlink time-frequency resource from a CCN, the scheduling privilege information corresponding to the downlink time-frequency resource indicating a scheduling privilege of the coordinated-transmission node over the downlink time-frequency resource; and performing, by the coordinated-transmission node, the scheduling in accordance with the received scheduling privilege information and the latest CSI reported by the terminal. According to the embodiments of the present disclosure, the CCN merely determines the scheduling privilege of each coordinated-transmission node over the downlink time-frequency resource, and each coordinated-transmission node performs the scheduling in accordance with its scheduling privilege and the latest CSI reported by the terminal that is connected to the coordinated-transmission node. As a result, it is able to prevent the CSI from being out-of-date due to the non-ideal Backhaul transmission delay, thereby to prevent the CoMP transmission performance from being adversely affected.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 72/14 (2009.01); H04L 5/00 (2006.01); H04W 72/12 (2009.01); H04L 25/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 72/1273 (2013.01); H04B 7/0456 (2013.01); H04B 7/0626 (2013.01); H04L 5/0035 (2013.01); H04W 72/1284 (2013.01); H04W 72/14 (2013.01); H04L 5/0007 (2013.01); H04L 5/0094 (2013.01); H04L 25/03 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 3018961 A1 20160511; EP 3018961 A4 20160615; EP 3018961 B1 20171004; CN 104284440 A 20150114; TW 201503642 A 20150116; TW I558140 B 20161111; US 2016219616 A1 20160728; WO 2015000419 A1 20150108

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602014015516

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 935158 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-04-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170307

2017-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 5/00 20060101ALI20170214BHEP

2017-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 25/03 20060101ALN20170214BHEP

2017-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 72/14 20090101AFI20170214BHEP

2017-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 72/12 20090101ALI20170214BHEP

2016-11-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161025

2016-10-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2016-06-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20160518

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 72/14 20090101AFI20160511BHEP

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 72/12 20090101ALI20160511BHEP

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 25/03 20060101ALN20160511BHEP

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 5/00 20060101ALI20160511BHEP

2016-05-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20151222

2016-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-05-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME