EP 3027181 A1 20160608 - DIETARY SUPPLEMENT
Title (en)
DIETARY SUPPLEMENT
Title (de)
NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNG
Title (fr)
COMPLÉMENT ALIMENTAIRE
Publication
Application
Priority
- GB 201313635 A 20130731
- GB 201318191 A 20131014
- GB 2014051870 W 20140618
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2015015149A1] The present invention relates to a dietary supplement comprising a blend of essential amino acids (EEAs) which is rich in leucine and its use in combatting the degenerative loss of muscle characteristics which typify sarcopenia.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A23L 33/17 (2016.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A23L 33/175 (2016.07); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/4172 (2013.01); A61P 21/00 (2017.12); A23V 2002/00 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2015015149A1
Citation (examination)
- EDGAR L. DILLON ET AL: "Amino Acid Supplementation Increases Lean Body Mass, Basal Muscle Protein Synthesis, and Insulin-Like Growth Factor-I Expression in Older Women", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, vol. 94, no. 5, 1 May 2009 (2009-05-01), US, pages 1630 - 1637, XP055472910, ISSN: 0021-972X, DOI: 10.1210/jc.2008-1564
- THEOCHARIS ISPOGLOU ET AL: "Novel essential amino acid supplements enriched with L-leucine facilitate increased protein and energy intakes in older women: a randomised controlled trial", NUTRITION JOURNAL, vol. 16, no. 1, 28 November 2017 (2017-11-28), XP055673889, DOI: 10.1186/s12937-017-0298-6
- MATTHEW BUTTERWORTH ET AL: "Acute effects of essential amino acid gel-based and whey protein supplements on appetite and energy intake in older women", APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, NUTRITION, AND METABOLISM, 1 November 2019 (2019-11-01), pages 1141 - 1149, XP055673895, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.nrcresearchpress.com/doi/10.1139/apnm-2018-0650#.XmC_mCFKgp8> [retrieved on 20200305], DOI: 10.1139/apnm-2018-0650
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2015015149 A1 20150205; EP 3027181 A1 20160608; EP 3738590 A1 20201118
DOCDB simple family (application)
GB 2014051870 W 20140618; EP 14734541 A 20140618; EP 20177706 A 20140618