Global Patent Index - EP 3036108 B1

EP 3036108 B1 2017-10-11 - PRINTING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR APPLYING A PRINTING MEDIUM

Title (en)

PRINTING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR APPLYING A PRINTING MEDIUM

Title (de)

DRUCKEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES DRUCKMITTELS

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION D'UN AGENT D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 3036108 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 14755070 A

Priority

  • DE 102013216770 A
  • EP 2014067860 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015025020A1] The invention relates to a printing apparatus for applying a printing medium to at least one printing substrate, wherein the printing apparatus (1) comprises at least one first printing module (2), wherein the first printing module (2) comprises at least one printing head (3a, 3b, 3c, 3d, 3e), wherein the printing apparatus (1) comprises at least one printing substrate holder (5), wherein the first printing module (2) can be moved in a printing direction (4) relative to the at least one printing substrate holder (5) of the printing apparatus (1), wherein the first printing module (2) can also be moved transversely to the printing direction (4) relative to the printing substrate holder (5) of the printing apparatus (1), wherein the printing substrate holder can also be moved along a closed path. The invention further relates to a method for applying a printing medium.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 19/14 (2006.01); B41J 3/28 (2006.01); B41J 3/60 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01); B41J 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 19/14 (2013.01); B41J 3/60 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01); B41J 25/001 (2013.01); B42D 25/23 (2014.10)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015025020 A1 20150226; DE 102013216770 A1 20150226; EP 3036108 A1 20160629; EP 3036108 B1 20171011

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180211

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-14 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171011

2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502014005806

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 935659 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-05-03 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170405

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 13/12 20060101ALI20170322BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 13/00 20060101ALI20170322BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 3/28 20060101ALI20170322BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 19/14 20060101AFI20170322BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 3/60 20060101ALI20170322BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 25/00 20060101ALI20170322BHEP

2017-03-22 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502014005806

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B41J0003600000

- IPC: B41J0019140000

2016-11-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-06-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-06-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME