Global Patent Index - EP 3039228 A4

EP 3039228 A4 2017-05-10 - EROSION RESISTANT BAFFLE FOR DOWNHOLE WELLBORE TOOLS

Title (en)

EROSION RESISTANT BAFFLE FOR DOWNHOLE WELLBORE TOOLS

Title (de)

EROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE ABLENKPLATTE FÜR BOHRLOCHWERKZEUGE

Title (fr)

DÉFLECTEUR RÉSISTANT À L'ÉROSION POUR DES OUTILS DE FOND DE TROU DE PUITS DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 3039228 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 13895955 A

Priority

US 2013065863 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015060809A1] Disclosed herein is a seat assembly for use in wellbore servicing systems, comprising a cylindrical baffle with an annular shaped seat with an upward facing seat for receiving an obturator, the seat defining a central passageway. Erosion resistance rings are placed inside of and in front the baffle to protect the baffle and seat from erosion cause by treatment fluids and solids passing through the servicing system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/12 (2006.01); E21B 33/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/26 (2013.01); E21B 34/063 (2013.01); E21B 34/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015060809 A1 20150430; AR 098127 A1 20160504; AU 2013403420 A1 20160317; AU 2013403420 B2 20161027; AU 2013403420 C1 20170316; CA 2924555 A1 20150430; CA 2924555 C 20180213; CA 2989547 A1 20150430; EP 3039228 A1 20160706; EP 3039228 A4 20170510; MX 2016003306 A 20161013

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180723

2018-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 43/26 20060101ALI20180612BHEP

2018-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 34/14 20060101ALI20180612BHEP

2018-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 34/06 20060101AFI20180612BHEP

2018-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180227

2017-05-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170411

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 33/12 20060101AFI20170405BHEP

2017-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 33/122 20060101ALI20170405BHEP

2017-01-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-07-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME