EP 3043650 A4 20171108 - CARBON DIOXIDE AND SALINE NASAL DELIVERY METHODS AND DELIVERY DEVICES
Title (en)
CARBON DIOXIDE AND SALINE NASAL DELIVERY METHODS AND DELIVERY DEVICES
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND ZUR NASALEN VERABREICHUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID UND KOCHSALZLÖSUNG UND VERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN
Title (fr)
MÉTHODES D'ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE NASALE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ET DE SÉRUM PHYSIOLOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION ASSOCIÉS
Publication
Application
Priority
US 2013000207 W 20130910
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2015038092A2] Methods for treating ailments in a patient in need thereof includes the step of directing a therapeutic, non-inhaled dosage to at least one nasal cavity of the patient through a flow regulating device while the patient refrains from inhaling. The dosage includes a saline fluid and a gas containing carbon dioxide, and, in some dosages, additional active component(s) wherein the therapeutic, non-inhaled dosage is delivered at a specified flow rate; the delivery devices are also included.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 31/185 (2006.01); A01N 59/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 33/14 (2006.01); A61M 11/02 (2006.01); A61P 11/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 33/00 (2013.01); A61K 33/14 (2013.01); A61M 11/007 (2014.02); A61M 11/02 (2013.01); A61P 11/02 (2017.12); A61K 9/0043 (2013.01); A61M 15/0031 (2014.02); A61M 16/14 (2013.01); A61M 2202/0225 (2013.01); A61M 2210/0618 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [I] WO 2012170677 A1 20121213 - PARION SCIENCES INC [US], et al
- [XI] JP 2003040766 A 20030213 - KAO CORP, et al
- [I] DE 20121474 U1 20030116 - ZELLNER GERHARD [DE]
- [I] WO 2005077189 A1 20050825 - CORDRAY SCOTT [US]
- [I] CN 1669559 A 20050921 - LIU ZHANXIN [CN]
- [XI] WO 2013123417 A1 20130822 - CAPNIA INC [US]
- [I] US 2009216183 A1 20090827 - MINOTTI AMERICO MICHAEL [US]
- [X] ANONYMOUS: "Emser Nasenspülsalz - Emser.de", 17 August 2013 (2013-08-17), XP055362236, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://web.archive.org/web/20130817071034/http://www.emser.de/emser-produkte/emser-nasenspuelsalz> [retrieved on 20170405]
- [X] NOVARTIS: "Rhinomer plus Nasenspray", 12 August 2009 (2009-08-12), XP055405022, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.mediherz-shop.de/images/ecommerce/01/80/01802262_1970-01_de_s.pdf> [retrieved on 20170908]
- [XI] DEGENHARD MARX: "Intranasal Saline: Can a Spray Per Day Keep the Doctor Away?", 12 March 2013 (2013-03-12), XP055405129, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.drug-dev.com/Main/Back-Issues/Intranasal-Saline-Can-a-Spray-Per-Day-Keep-the-Doc-530.aspx> [retrieved on 20170908]
- See references of WO 2015038092A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2015038092 A2 20150319; WO 2015038092 A3 20150716; AU 2013400183 A1 20160317; AU 2013400183 B2 20170427; CA 2923793 A1 20150319; CA 2923793 C 20180227; EP 3043650 A2 20160720; EP 3043650 A4 20171108; JP 2016529082 A 20160923; MX 2016002968 A 20161202
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2013000207 W 20130910; AU 2013400183 A 20130910; CA 2923793 A 20130910; EP 13893220 A 20130910; JP 2016541940 A 20130910; MX 2016002968 A 20130910