EP 3058137 B1 20210331 - PACKAGING UNIT COMPRISING NON-WOOD LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH PACKAGING UNIT
Title (en)
PACKAGING UNIT COMPRISING NON-WOOD LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH PACKAGING UNIT
Title (de)
NAHRUNGSVERPACKUNGFORMTEIL BESTEHEND AUS GRASFASERN UND ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN
Title (fr)
MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE D'ALIMENT EN PATÉ MOULÉE DE GRAMEN ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 13188739 A 20131015
- EP 2014071798 W 20141010
- EP 14783626 A 20141010
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP2862815A1] The invention relates to a method for manufacturing a moulded fibre packaging in particular a food package , more particular an egg package, comprising, - providing a fibre pulp for a moulding process, the fibre pulp being contained in a pulp container, characterized in that the method comprises, - adding lignocellulosic biomass not originating from wood to the pulp container to obtain a pulp mix comprising between 5-80% lignocellulosic biomass, wherein the lignocellulosic biomass contains between 0 to 2% protein in dry weight
IPC 8 full level
D21J 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/32 (2006.01); D21H 11/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B65D 85/324 (2013.01 - US); D21H 11/12 (2013.01 - EP US); D21H 17/12 (2013.01 - US); D21H 21/28 (2013.01 - US); D21J 7/00 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (examination)
- WO 2013141686 A1 20130926 - PARASURAMAN RAMANESS [MY]
- WO 2008035082 A1 20080327 - PROCURASELL HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al
- GB 2449507 A 20081126 - PROCURASELL HOLDINGS LTD [GB]
- WO 2013141687 A1 20130926 - PARASURAMAN RAMANESS [MY]
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Brodrene Hartmann
- WO 2013141686 A1 20130926 - PARASURAMAN RAMANESS [MY]
- WO 2008035082 A1 20080327 - PROCURASELL HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al
- GB 2449507 A 20081126 - PROCURASELL HOLDINGS LTD [GB]
- WO 2013141687 A1 20130926 - PARASURAMAN RAMANESS [MY]
- JP 2002088677 A 20020327 - ROU KUWOKU
- WO 2013033405 A1 20130307 - CARGILL INC [US], et al
- US 3102364 A 19630903 - PULLEN JOSEPH A
- US 8561823 B1 20131022 - KRUPA CALVIN S [US]
- DE 19618554 A1 19971127 - RUEHLAND LOTHAR [DE]
- EP 3256402 B1 20190410 - HUHTAMAKI MOLDED FIBER TECH BV [NL]
- WO 2008143510 A1 20081127 - HUHTAMAKI NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al
- EP 0631009 A1 19941228 - GRETHER TILL [CH]
- ANONYMOUS: "Sugarcane bagasse | Feedipedia", FEEDIPEDIA, 24 October 2012 (2012-10-24), pages 1 - 3, XP055879015, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://feedipedia.org/node/559> [retrieved on 20220114]
- ANONYMOUS: "papain | enzyme | Britannica", BRITANNICA, 21 December 2021 (2021-12-21), pages 1 - 2, XP055879017, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.britannica.com/science/papain> [retrieved on 20220114]
- ANONYMOUS: "Papain - an overview | ScienceDirect Topics", SCIENCEDIRECT TOPICS, 1 January 2012 (2012-01-01), pages 1 - 8, XP055879020, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.sciencedirect.com/topics/nursing-and-health-professions/papain> [retrieved on 20220114]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2862815 A1 20150422; EP 2862815 B1 20170322; DK 2862815 T3 20170508; DK 3058137 T3 20210510; EP 3058137 A1 20160824; EP 3058137 B1 20210331; ES 2624552 T3 20170714; ES 2872448 T3 20211102; HR P20170606 T1 20170908; HR P20210784 T1 20210625; HU E033565 T2 20171228; HU E054253 T2 20210830; PL 2862815 T3 20170929; PL 3058137 T3 20210927; TR 201708733 T4 20181121; US 2016257486 A1 20160908; WO 2015055544 A1 20150423; WO 2015057061 A1 20150423
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 13188739 A 20131015; DK 13188739 T 20131015; DK 14783626 T 20141010; EP 14783626 A 20141010; EP 2014071798 W 20141010; ES 13188739 T 20131015; ES 14783626 T 20141010; HR P20170606 T 20170418; HR P20210784 T 20210514; HU E13188739 A 20131015; HU E14783626 A 20141010; NL 2014050712 W 20141014; PL 13188739 T 20131015; PL 14783626 T 20141010; TR 201708733 T 20131015; US 201415028859 A 20141010