Global Patent Index - EP 3071492 A4

EP 3071492 A4 2017-05-24 - CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER

Title (en)

CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

FERMETURE POUR RÉCIPIENT

Publication

EP 3071492 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 14861803 A

Priority

  • US 201361905488 P
  • US 2014063816 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015073256A1] A closure assembly for use on a container neck finish has an inner cap which threadedly engages the neck finish and an outer cap which is received by the inner cap. Torque lugs on the outer cap cooperate with abutment formations on the inner cap such that rotation of the outer cap drives the inner cap onto the neck finish. Cooperative engagement between the two caps is achieved by downward axial movement of the outer cap. An arrangement of ramp sections on the inner cap and an arrangement of interior lugs on the outer cap provide an assist feature helping to pull the outer cap in the axially downward direction. Another feature of the closure assembly includes a spring-biasing relationship between the inner and outer caps. The inner cap also includes an abutment structure which cooperates with the container to limit drop test deformation of the container.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/041 (2013.01); B65D 1/0246 (2013.01); B65D 2215/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015073256 A1 20150521; AU 2014349035 A1 20160602; CN 105899439 A 20160824; EP 3071492 A1 20160928; EP 3071492 A4 20170524; MX 2016006234 A 20160808; US 2016257462 A1 20160908

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171123

2017-05-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 50/04 20060101AFI20170420BHEP

2017-02-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUGHMAN, GARY, M.

2016-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOUSE, SIMON, C.

2016-09-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160617

2016-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-09-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME