Global Patent Index - EP 3076867 A4

EP 3076867 A4 2017-10-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFICATION OF SEIZURE TYPE AND SEVERITY USING ELECTROMYOGRAPHY

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFICATION OF SEIZURE TYPE AND SEVERITY USING ELECTROMYOGRAPHY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG DES TYPS UND SCHWEREGRADES VON ANFÄLLEN MITTELS ELEKTROMYOGRAFIE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CLASSIFICATION DU TYPE ET DE LA GRAVITÉ D'UNE CRISE D'ÉPILEPSIE À L'AIDE DE L'ÉLECTROMYOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 3076867 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 14868097 A

Priority

  • US 201361910827 P
  • US 201461969660 P
  • US 201461979225 P
  • US 201462001302 P
  • US 201462032147 P
  • US 201462050054 P
  • US 2014068246 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015084899A1] A method and apparatus for monitoring a patient for seizure activity including collecting and processing EMG signal data and categorizing tire detected data to execute risk stratification. A transmission protocol that is tailored for detected events may be selected and executed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/02 (2006.01); A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/0488 (2006.01); G06F 3/0484 (2013.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01); A61B 5/145 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0488 (2013.01); A61B 5/0002 (2013.01); A61B 5/4094 (2013.01); A61B 5/7282 (2013.01); G06F 19/00 (2013.01); G06F 19/3418 (2013.01); A61B 5/14542 (2013.01); A61B 5/7264 (2013.01); A61B 2505/07 (2013.01); A61B 2560/0242 (2013.01); A61B 2562/0219 (2013.01); G16H 50/20 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XYI] US 2013012830 A1 20130110 - LEININGER JAMES R [US], et al
  • [Y] M R JAMES ET AL: "Pulse oximetry during apparent tonic-clonic seizures", THE LANCET, vol. 337, 16 February 1991 (1991-02-16), pages 394 - 395, XP055396741
  • [A] CHE-CHANG YANG AND YEH-LIANG HSU: "A review of accelerometry-based wearable motion detectors for physical activity monitoring", MEDLINE,, vol. 10, no. 8, 20 August 2010 (2010-08-20), pages 7772 - 7788, XP002694955, DOI: 10.3390/S100807772
  • [A] SÁNDOR BENICZKY ET AL: "Detection of generalized tonic-clonic seizures by a wireless wrist accelerometer: A prospective, multicenter study", EPILEPSIA, vol. 54, no. 4, 8 February 2013 (2013-02-08), NEW YORK, US, pages e58 - e61, XP055396739, ISSN: 0013-9580, DOI: 10.1111/epi.12120
  • See also references of WO 2015084899A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015084899 A1 20150611; AU 2014360720 A1 20160630; AU 2017245430 A1 20171102; CA 2931982 A1 20150611; EP 3076867 A1 20161012; EP 3076867 A4 20171004; JP 2016538931 A 20161215; MX 2016007210 A 20160908

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170906

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 3/0484 20130101ALI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/0488 20060101ALI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/02 20060101AFI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 19/00 20110101ALI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/145 20060101ALN20170831BHEP

2017-03-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-10-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-10-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME