EP 3080356 B1 20180425 - RAIL VEHICLE COMPRISING SNOW PLOUGH
Title (en)
RAIL VEHICLE COMPRISING SNOW PLOUGH
Title (de)
SCHIENENFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM SCHNEERÄUMER
Title (fr)
VÉHICULE SUR RAILS COMPRENANT UN CHASSE-NEIGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 102014203734 A 20140228
- EP 2015052471 W 20150206
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2015128166A1] The invention relates to a rail vehicle (14) comprising a vehicle body which is supported in a sprung fashion on bogies, and a snow plough (1) which has two blade plates (3) which run to a point (2) in a ploughed shape and have a C-shaped profile, and a plough blade (5) which is arranged in a vertically adjustable fashion behind the blade plates (3) in the direction of travel (4) and whose projecting portion (7), which projects downwards beyond a lower edge (6) of the blade plates (3), is adjustable. The blade plates (3) rest with their lower edge (6) on a base plate (8) which forms a cutting edge (9) which protrudes from the lower edge (6) in the direction of travel (4). According to the invention, the snow plough (1) is attached to an underframe (16) of the vehicle body in such a way that the base plate (8) of the snow plough (1) maintains a safety distance from the travel rails (15), which safety distance is predefined by maximum spring compression of the vehicle body, wherein the protruding portion (7) of the plough blade (5) is set as a function of the safety distance and of wear of the wheel tyres of rail wheels of the bogies.
IPC 8 full level
B61F 19/06 (2006.01); B61F 19/04 (2006.01); E01H 8/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP RU US)
B61F 19/04 (2013.01 - EP RU US); B61F 19/06 (2013.01 - EP US); E01H 5/061 (2013.01 - EP US); E01H 8/04 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Bombardier Transportation GmbH
- WO 2015128166 A1 20150903 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- EP 1070792 B1 20051221 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- JP H10252030 A 19980922 - HOKKAIDO RIYOKAKU TETSUDO KK, et al
- US 6688021 B2 20040210 - BAIG MIRZA AREF AHMED [US], et al
- US 51829 A 18660102
- DE 102009019576 A1 20101104 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- DE 19933914 A1 20010125 - SIEMENS KRAUSS MAFFEI LOKOMOTI [DE]
- DE 19933915 A1 20010125 - SIEMENS KRAUSS MAFFEI LOKOMOTI [DE]
- US 1518685 A 19241209 - JOHN BERCZIK
- US 1207789 A 19161212 - PACKER EBEN R [US]
- US 345257 A 18860706
- JP S63141220 U 19880916
- US 289705 A 18831204
- JP S4897209 A 19731211
- US 517478 A 18940403
- US 2009307940 A1 20091217 - MAAS ANDREW J [US], et al
- WO 2015043661 A1 20150402 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- WO 2010124925 A1 20101104 - SIEMENS AG [DE], et al
- EP 1070791 A2 20010124 - SIEMENS KRAUSS MAFFEI LOKOMOTI [DE]
- LOEBER M; ET AL: "INNOVATIVE CRASHFAEHIGE KASTENSTRUKTUR DER TRAXX-LOKOMOTIVEN//INNOVATIVE CRASHWORTHY CARBODY STRUCTURE OF THE TRAXX LOCOMOTIVE//UNE STRUCTURE DE CAISSE INNOVANTE ET RESISTANTE AUX COLLISIONS POUR LES LOCOMOTIVES TRAXX", EB- ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, August 2004 (2004-08-01), XP001201811
- WILFRIED WOLTER, FEDERIC B. CARL, BERNHARD BLOESS: "10 Jahre praktische Nutzung europäischer Forschungsergebnisse zur Kollisionssicherheit von Schienenfahrzeugen Teil I: Von den Anfängen zum aktuellen Beispiel: Bombardier-Lokomotive TRAXX AC3", ZEVRAIL, vol. 137, 3 March 2013 (2013-03-03), pages 68 - 76, XP055555166
- WILFRIED WOLTER; FEDERIC B CARL; BERNHARD BLOESS: "10 Jahre praktische Nutzung europäischer Forschungsergebnisse zur Kollisionssicherheit von Schienenfahrzeugen Teil II: Ansätze für wirtschaftliche Crashkonzepte, Betriebserfahrungen und Anregungen für das europäische Regelwerk", ZEVRAIL, April 2013 (2013-04-01), pages 116 - 125, XP001582105
- WILFRIED WOLTER; FEDERIC B CARL; BERNHARD BLOESS: "Die Baureihe 185.2 im Spiegel künftiger Anforderungen an die Kollisionssicherheit", EI - EISENBAHNINGENIEUR, vol. 56, September 2005 (2005-09-01), pages 61 - 68, XP055555197
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2015128166 A1 20150903; EP 3080356 A1 20161019; EP 3080356 B1 20180425; ES 2672796 T3 20180618; PL 3080356 T3 20180928; RU 2642205 C2 20180124; TR 201808621 T4 20180723; US 2016369464 A1 20161222; US 9963845 B2 20180508
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2015052471 W 20150206; EP 15705230 A 20150206; ES 15705230 T 20150206; PL 15705230 T 20150206; RU 2016128988 A 20150206; TR 201808621 T 20150206; US 201515122211 A 20150206