EP 3082817 A4 20170621 - COMPOSITIONS FOR DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Title (en)
COMPOSITIONS FOR DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Title (de)
ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG
Title (fr)
COMPOSITIONS POUR ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201314133350 A 20131218
- US 2014070944 W 20141217
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2015095389A1] The present invention provides compositions and methods and for increasing the bioavailability of therapeutic agents in a subject. The compositions include at least one alkyl glycoside and at least one therapeutic agent, wherein the alkylglycoside has an alkyl chain length from about 10 to about 16 carbon atoms.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 9/0043 (2013.01); A61K 9/0048 (2013.01); A61K 9/0056 (2013.01); A61K 9/2018 (2013.01); A61K 31/135 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/4045 (2013.01); A61K 31/4535 (2013.01); A61K 31/485 (2013.01); A61K 31/551 (2013.01); A61K 38/22 (2013.01); A61K 38/26 (2013.01); A61K 47/26 (2013.01); A61P 25/04 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [I] WO 2004054542 A2 20040701 - DURECT CORP [US], et al
- [I] US 2006045868 A1 20060302 - MEEZAN ELIAS [US], et al
- [Y] WO 0076506 A1 20001221 - NASTECH PHARM CO [US]
- [Y] DAVIS S S ET AL: "ABSORPTION ENHANCERS FOR NASAL DRUG DELIVERY", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD., AUCKLAND, NZ, vol. 42, no. 13, 1 January 2003 (2003-01-01), pages 1107 - 1128, XP009040612, ISSN: 0312-5963, DOI: 10.2165/00003088-200342130-00003
- [Y] EDWARD T MAGGIO: "Intravail: highly effective intranasal delivery of peptide and protein drugs", EXPERT OPINION ON DRUG DELIVERY, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, GB, vol. 3, no. 4, 1 July 2006 (2006-07-01), pages 529 - 539, XP008152448, ISSN: 1742-5247, DOI: 10.1517/17425247.3.4.529
- [Y] EDWARD T. MAGGIO ET AL: "High efficiency intranasal drug delivery using Intravail alkylsaccharide absorption enhancers", DRUG DELIVERY AND TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, vol. 3, no. 1, 12 May 2012 (2012-05-12), Germany, pages 16 - 25, XP055370902, ISSN: 2190-393X, DOI: 10.1007/s13346-012-0069-z
- See references of WO 2015095389A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2015095389 A1 20150625; EP 3082817 A1 20161026; EP 3082817 A4 20170621
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2014070944 W 20141217; EP 14872645 A 20141217