Global Patent Index - EP 3092585 A4

EP 3092585 A4 2017-10-11 - AUTOMATED DESIGN ENABLERS METHODOLOGY

Title (en)

AUTOMATED DESIGN ENABLERS METHODOLOGY

Title (de)

AUTOMATISIERTE ENTWURFSAKTIVIERUNGSMETHODOLOGIE

Title (fr)

MÉTHODOLOGIE DE FACILITATEURS DE CONCEPTION INFORMATISÉE

Publication

EP 3092585 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 15735527 A

Priority

  • US 201461926508 P
  • US 2015011208 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2015199459A1] A selection of one of the selectable members of a finite element model is received. Dimensions of the selected member are received. A number of desired instances of the selected member with the dimensions and a location of each of the instances are received. A revised finite element model of the mechanical system including the number of instances of the selected member is generated. The revised finite element model including the instances of the selected member at each respective locations are displayed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/5018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] US 2005091010 A1 20050428 - FOX MICHAEL K [US], et al
  • [XYI] HOWENGINEERSDOIT!: "Catia V5 Powerful Tricks #129|How to Reuse pattern with Generated Constraints from Spec Tree", 12 June 2013 (2013-06-12), XP054977507, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=ppoELjNepoc> [retrieved on 20170704]
  • [XYI] INVENTORMASTERS: "Autodesk Inventor Copy Features", YOUTUBE, 22 December 2009 (2009-12-22), pages 2 pp., XP054977509, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=aLHtofGNiyo> [retrieved on 20170704]
  • See also references of WO 2015106271A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2015199459 A1 20150716; EP 3092585 A1 20161116; EP 3092585 A4 20171011; WO 2015106271 A1 20150716

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170907

2017-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/50 20060101AFI20170901BHEP

2017-04-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-11-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160812

2016-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME