Global Patent Index - EP 3094771 B1

EP 3094771 B1 2017-10-04 - BRAIDING MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR RADIAL OR SPIRAL BRAIDING MACHINE

Title (en)

BRAIDING MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR RADIAL OR SPIRAL BRAIDING MACHINE

Title (de)

FLECHTMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE RADIAL- ODER SPIRALFLECHTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MÉTIER À TRESSER, EN PARTICULIER MÉTIER POUR TRESSAGE RADIAL OU MÉTIER POUR TRESSAGE EN SPIRALE

Publication

EP 3094771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 14816177 A

Priority

  • DE 102014200580 A
  • EP 2014077206 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015106889A1] Disclosed is a braiding machine (10), in particular a radial or spiral braiding machine for manufacturing tubular or flat braided articles, comprising a first horn gear plane (12) on which drivable or movably coupled horn gears (14) are provided for guiding bobbins (16) that carry yarns. The yarns are braided in a central braiding point. The disclosed braiding machine is characterized in that a positioning module (22) is arranged between the first horn gear plane (12) and the central braiding point and comprises yarn guiding elements (26) for guiding the individual yarns (18) and locating same during the braiding process.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/40 (2006.01); D04C 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/48 (2013.01); D04C 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102014200580 B3 20150716; EP 3094771 A1 20161123; EP 3094771 B1 20171004; WO 2015106889 A1 20150723

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 4

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-07 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 4

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 4

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502014005723

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934141 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-06-28 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170602

2017-04-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHROLL, CHRISTOPH

2016-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AHLBORN, HOLGER

2016-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VON REDEN, TJARK

2016-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160616

2016-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME