Global Patent Index - EP 3095370 B1

EP 3095370 B1 2017-10-11 - CLEANING SYSTEM WITH MOTION AND/OR POSITION DETECTION

Title (en)

CLEANING SYSTEM WITH MOTION AND/OR POSITION DETECTION

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT BEWEGUNGS- UND/ODER POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE DOTÉ D'UNE DÉTERMINATION DE POSITION ET/OU DE MOUVEMENT

Publication

EP 3095370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 15167972 A

Priority

EP 15167972 A

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/20 (2006.01); A47L 13/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/20 (2013.01); A47L 13/50 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 3095370 A1 20161123; EP 3095370 B1 20171011; DK 3095370 T3 20180102; ES 2654172 T3 20180212

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2654172 T3

- Effective date: 20180212

2018-01-10 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20171221

2018-01-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502015002045

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 935278 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170711

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 13/50 20060101ALI20170531BHEP

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 13/20 20060101AFI20170531BHEP

2017-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170213

2017-03-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-23 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2016-11-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME