Global Patent Index - EP 3106263 B1

EP 3106263 B1 20190424 - PRESS HEAD AND PRESSING TOOL WITH PRESSING HEADS

Title (en)

PRESS HEAD AND PRESSING TOOL WITH PRESSING HEADS

Title (de)

PRESSKOPF SOWIE PRESSWERKZEUG MIT PRESSKÖPFEN

Title (fr)

TÊTE DE PRESSE ET OUTIL DE PRESSE AVEC TÊTES DE PRESSE

Publication

EP 3106263 B1 20190424 (DE)

Application

EP 16001253 A 20160603

Priority

DE 102015007869 A 20150615

IPC 8 full level

B25B 1/20 (2006.01); B25B 1/24 (2006.01); B25B 5/14 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Citation (opposition)

Opponent : REHAU AG + Co,

  • WO 2010012374 A1 20100204 - REHAU AG & CO, et al
  • DE 102004018429 A1 20051027 - FOELL REMSWERK [DE]
  • WO 9620807 A1 19960711 - DEUTSCH CO [US]
  • DE 19621877 A1 19971204 - REHAU AG & CO [DE]
  • DE 10143649 A1 20030320 - RECKZEH MANFRED [DE], et al
  • DE 29713844 U1 19971113 - KNIPPING DANIEL [DE], et al
  • REHAU: "Rautitan Plumbing System, Product list for Australia", REHAU, UNLIMITED POLYMER SOLUTIONS, 1 October 2006 (2006-10-01), pages 1 - 20, XP055692998
  • Technische Zeichnung des "L1 JAW 16/20 PX", datierend auf den 15 February 2013 (2013-02-15)
  • Rechnung des REHAU Ltd. an Reece NZ, Ltd., datierend auf den 30 October 2013 (2013-10-30)
  • ANONYMOUS: "Sioux Chief PEX F2080", SIOUX CHIEF PEX F2080, 26 November 2013 (2013-11-26), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=FLhddKA1lfQ>

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 3106263 A1 20161221; EP 3106263 B1 20190424; DE 102015007869 A1 20161215

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 16001253 A 20160603; DE 102015007869 A 20150615