Global Patent Index - EP 3107546 A4

EP 3107546 A4 2017-10-25 - THERAPEUTIC METHODS EMPLOYING NORIBOGAINE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC METHODS EMPLOYING NORIBOGAINE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN MIT NORIBOGAIN UND VERWANDTEN VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

MÉTHODES THÉRAPEUTIQUES FAISANT INTERVENIR DE LA NORIBOGAÏNE ET DES COMPOSÉS APPARENTÉS

Publication

EP 3107546 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 15751574 A

Priority

  • US 201461941387 P
  • US 201461941390 P
  • US 201461945746 P
  • US 2014019692 W
  • US 201414195822 A
  • US 201461952727 P
  • US 201461952731 P
  • US 201461952733 P
  • US 201461952738 P
  • US 201461952741 P
  • US 201461952744 P
  • US 201414292632 A
  • US 201462005841 P
  • US 201462005847 P
  • US 201462005851 P
  • US 201462005855 P
  • US 201462005858 P
  • US 201462007346 P
  • US 201462024388 P
  • US 201462033538 P
  • US 201462035335 P
  • US 201414485514 A
  • US 2015016186 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: TW201534306A] This invention is directed to the use of noribogaine, noribogaine derivative, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt and/or solvate thereof at a dosage that provides a therapeutic serum concentration for treating a disease or disorder as described herein in a patient.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] WO 2014144508 A2 20140918 - DEMERX INC [US]
  • [XY] WO 9911250 A2 19990311 - NOVONEURON INC [US], et al
  • [X] US 7220737 B1 20070522 - MASH DEBORAH C [US]
  • [Y] WO 9603127 A1 19960208 - NDA INT INC [US]
  • [X] HEMENDRA N BHARGAVA ET AL: "Effects of noribogaine on the development of tolerance to antinociceptive action of morphine in mice", BRAIN RESEARCH, vol. 771, no. 2, 1 October 1997 (1997-10-01), AMSTERDAM, NL, pages 343 - 346, XP055406445, ISSN: 0006-8993, DOI: 10.1016/S0006-8993(97)00914-1
  • [Y] MICHAEL BAUMANN: "In vivo neurobiological effects of ibogaine and its O-desmethyl methabolite, 12-hydroxyibogamine (noribogaine) in rats)", 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), XP055405640, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://jpet.aspetjournals.org/content/jpet/297/2/531.full.pdf> [retrieved on 20170912]
  • [A] STALLVIK MARIANNE ET AL: "Corrected QT interval during treatment with methadone and buprenorphine-Relation to doses and serum concentrations", DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, IR, vol. 129, no. 1, 16 October 2012 (2012-10-16), pages 88 - 93, XP028988598, ISSN: 0376-8716, DOI: 10.1016/J.DRUGALCDEP.2012.09.016
  • [A] KOENIG XAVER ET AL: "Anti-addiction drug ibogaine inhibits voltage-gated ionic currents: A study to assess the drug's cardiac ion channel profile", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 273, no. 2, 22 May 2013 (2013-05-22), pages 259 - 268, XP028784922, ISSN: 0041-008X, DOI: 10.1016/J.TAAP.2013.05.012

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015126836 A2 20150827; AU 2015219172 A1 20160929; CA 2977636 A1 20150827; CN 106413718 A 20170215; EA 201691656 A2 20170331; EP 3107546 A2 20161228; EP 3107546 A4 20171025; JP 2017506244 A 20170302; KR 20160124829 A 20161028; TW 201534306 A 20150916

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170926

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 25/30 20060101ALI20170920BHEP

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/55 20060101AFI20170920BHEP

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 25/04 20060101ALI20170920BHEP

2017-05-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2016-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160913

2016-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME