Global Patent Index - EP 3109566 A4

EP 3109566 A4 2017-10-18 - AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGENVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION

Publication

EP 3109566 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 14883224 A

Priority

JP 2014053809 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP3109566A1] An air-conditioning apparatus includes a first expansion device provided between a heat source-side heat exchanger and a load-side expansion device, a bypass pipe having one end connected between the first expansion device and the heat source-side heat exchanger, and allowing refrigerant flowing out of the first expansion device to flow through the bypass pipe, an auxiliary heat exchanger cooling refrigerant flowing through the bypass pipe and supplying the cooled refrigerant to a suction part of a compressor, a second expansion device regulating a flow rate of refrigerant allowed to flow into the suction part of the compressor from the auxiliary heat exchanger, a refrigerant flow switching device, and a controller configured to control an opening degree of the first expansion device and an opening degree of the second expansion device. When the heat source-side heat exchanger acts as a condenser or a gas cooler, the controller is configured to control the first expansion device and the second expansion device to allow high-pressure refrigerant to flow into the auxiliary heat exchanger. When the heat source-side heat exchanger acts as an evaporator, the controller is configured to control the first expansion device to allow medium-pressure refrigerant to flow into the auxiliary heat exchanger, and control the second expansion device to allow refrigerant cooled in the auxiliary heat exchanger to flow into the suction part of the compressor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/00 (2006.01); F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/06 (2006.01); F24F 11/08 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 13/00 (2013.01); F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 11/83 (2018.01); F24F 11/89 (2018.01); F25B 2313/021 (2013.01); F25B 2313/0233 (2013.01); F25B 2313/02741 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01); F25B 2600/2513 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 3109566 A1 20161228; EP 3109566 A4 20171018; EP 3109566 B1 20180808; JP 6038382 B2 20161207; JP WO2015125219 A1 20170330; WO 2015125219 A1 20150827

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602014030248

2018-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1027456 T

- Effective date: 20180815

2018-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-08-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-03-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180221

2018-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/89 20180101ALI20180207BHEP

2018-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/83 20180101ALI20180207BHEP

2018-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/30 20180101ALI20180207BHEP

2018-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 13/00 20060101ALI20180207BHEP

2018-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 1/00 20060101AFI20180207BHEP

2017-10-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170920

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/08 20060101ALI20170914BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 13/00 20060101ALI20170914BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 1/00 20060101AFI20170914BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/02 20060101ALI20170914BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/06 20060101ALI20170914BHEP

2017-05-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2016-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160713

2016-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME