Global Patent Index - EP 3110717 A4

EP 3110717 A4 2017-10-18 - SEMI-RIGID SHIPPING CONTAINER WITH PEEL-RESEAL CLOSURE

Title (en)

SEMI-RIGID SHIPPING CONTAINER WITH PEEL-RESEAL CLOSURE

Title (de)

HALBSTARRER FRACHTCONTAINER MIT WIEDERVERSIEGELBAREM ABLÖSEVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR D'EXPÉDITION SEMI-RIGIDE À FERMETURE À DÉCOLLEMENT-RECOLLEMENT

Publication

EP 3110717 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 15754813 A

Priority

  • US 201461946654 P
  • US 2015018160 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015131137A1] The present disclosure, in one embodiment, relates to a packaging assembly for holding liquids, viscous material, or particulate material. The packaging assembly includes a carton having side and bottom walls and an open top. A self-supporting plastic liner fits inside of the carton and is for containing liquids, viscous material, or particulate material. The liner has a side wall, a closed bottom end, and an open top end having an outwardly-projecting rim. The rim has a radially-extending flange portion, and a dependent skirt portion. When the self-supporting plastic liner is inside of the carton, the dependent skirt portion of the rim hangs over the side walls of the carton. A lidding material is removeably affixed to the rim of the plastic liner. A carton lid closes off the open top of the carton.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/062 (2013.01); B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 43/0222 (2013.01); B65D 77/2024 (2013.01); B65D 77/2032 (2013.01); B65D 77/2096 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/005 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00203 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00268 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00435 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0062 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015131137 A1 20150903; CA 2944615 A1 20150903; EP 3110717 A1 20170104; EP 3110717 A4 20171018; JP 2017507095 A 20170316; MX 2016011184 A 20161216

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170915

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 77/04 20060101AFI20170911BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANNER, JOE

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCHENAN, ROBERT

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SULLIVAN, JOSEPH

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOSLING, STEVE

2017-06-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANNER, JOE

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOSLING, STEVE

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCHENEN, BOB

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SULLIVAN, JOSEPH

2017-01-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-01-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME